North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Robert T Numbers, II
Case #: 5:23-cv-00526
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Feb 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 6:31 AM EDT
Defendant
John Doe
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Inez de Ondarza Simmons
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, February 23, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 02/23 6:04 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC as to John Doe. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Thu 12/28 2:59 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until February 23, 2024 to effectuate service of a summons and Complaint on Defendant. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 12/28/2023. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
utility Motion Submitted Wed 12/27 4:19 PM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding8 First MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process . (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time-Other Tue 12/26 5:26 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 02, 2023
utility Case Selected for Mediation Thu 11/02 11:57 AM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website,[LINK:www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx] . Please serve this list on all parties. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Mon 10/30 4:03 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 10/30/2023. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
utility Motion Submitted Thu 10/19 1:24 PM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding5 MOTION for for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
6 6 13 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 10/17 2:09 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding5 MOTION for Discovery for Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick Paige,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Susan B Stalzer,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of David Williamson
5 5 motion Discovery Tue 10/17 2:07 PM
MOTION for Discovery for Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 06, 2023
utility Case Selected for Mediation Fri 10/06 3:53 PM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website,[LINK:www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx] . Please serve this list on all parties. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
4 4 notice Document Thu 09/28 8:51 AM
COPYRIGHT REPORT: Copy of report forwarded to Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 via US Mail on September 28, 2023. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 09/26 8:17 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/26 8:16 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Inez de Ondarza Simmons on behalf of Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/26 8:13 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7284799.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit Works List,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet