North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Referred: Robert T Numbers, II
Case #: 5:23-cv-00528
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Feb 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 6:32 AM EDT
Defendant
John Doe
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Inez de Ondarza Simmons
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 02/21 4:25 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC as to John Doe. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Wed 12/27 12:36 PM
ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Effectuate Service. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 12/27/2023. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Referred Wed 12/27 11:07 AM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding9 First MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process . (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time-Other Tue 12/26 5:27 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 27, 2023
8 8 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Fri 10/27 3:47 PM
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Early Discovery. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 10/27/2023. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
7 7 13 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 10/24 1:19 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding5 MOTION for Discovery for Early Discovery Corrected filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick Paige,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Susan B Stalzer,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of David Williamson
utility Motions No Longer Referred Tue 10/24 1:53 PM
Motion No Longer Referred:5 MOTION for Discovery for Early Discovery . (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Referred Tue 10/24 1:56 PM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding5 MOTION for Discovery for Early Discovery . (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
utility Motion Referred Wed 10/18 9:54 AM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A Swank regarding5 MOTION for Discovery for Early Discovery . (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
6 6 13 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 10/17 2:17 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding5 MOTION for Discovery for Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick Paige,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Susan B Stalzer,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of David Williamson
5 5 motion Discovery Tue 10/17 2:14 PM
MOTION for Discovery for Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 29, 2023
4 4 notice Document Fri 09/29 1:27 PM
COPYRIGHT REPORT: Copy of report forwarded to Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 via US Mail on September 29, 2023. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 09/26 8:32 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/26 8:31 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Inez de Ondarza Simmons on behalf of Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/26 8:29 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7284822.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Simmons, Inez)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit Works List,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet