Murray v. United States of America
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard E Myers, II |
Referred: | Brian S Meyers |
Case #: | 7:23-cv-01350 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | Camp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022 |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 6:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
|
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Joseph Murray
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Patrick Murray. (Messner, Frederick) Modified text on 3/19/2024 |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Appearance filed by LaCresha A. Johnson on behalf of United States of America. (Johnson, LaCresha) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Appearance filed by Alanna Horan on behalf of United States of America. (Horan, Alanna) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Zina Bash on behalf of Patrick Murray. (Bash, Zina) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit (Zina Bash) filed by Patrick Murray. (Messner, Frederick) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
order
Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/17 3:37 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Zina Bash must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/17/2023. |
||
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
service
Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case
Wed 09/27 10:04 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. |
||
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Appearance filed by William Michael Dowling on behalf of Patrick Murray. (Dowling, William) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Notice of Appearance filed by Frederick Messner on behalf of Patrick Murray. (Messner, Frederick) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Financial Disclosure Statement by Patrick Murray (Messner, Frederick) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7284724.), filed by Patrick Murray. (Messner, Frederick) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |