North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Louise Wood Flanagan
Case #: 7:23-cv-01353
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 6:33 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Nathan Jisu Bu
Doj-Civ
contact info
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
Plaintiff
Leodis Nevels
Represented By
William Michael Dowling
The Dowling Firm PLLC
contact info
Zina Bash
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Frederick Messner
Keller Postman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, March 25, 2024
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/25 4:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (SHORT FORM) against United States of America, filed by Leodis Nevels. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/20 8:57 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Nathan Jisu Bu on behalf of United States of America. (Bu, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Special Appearance Wed 10/18 3:46 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Zina Bash on behalf of Leodis Nevels. (Bash, Zina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Tue 10/17 2:23 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit (Zina Bash) filed by Leodis Nevels. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PHV Fee Receipt
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/17 3:54 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Zina Bash must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/17/2023. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Wed 09/27 9:16 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/26 6:06 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by William Michael Dowling on behalf of Leodis Nevels. (Dowling, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/26 5:58 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Frederick Messner on behalf of Leodis Nevels. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 09/26 5:58 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Leodis Nevels (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/26 5:57 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7284754.), filed by Leodis Nevels. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet