Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:23-mj-01703
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 27, 2023 2:47 AM CDT
Defendant
Felipe Angel Leal, Jr (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Melissa Evelia Lopez
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Material Witness
Grebil Dorian Aguilar-Benitez
Represented By
Sandra I Suarez
Sandra I. Suarez
contact info
Material Witness
Gilmer Osmin Salazar-Avalos
Represented By
Sandra I Suarez
Sandra I. Suarez
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Cahal Patrick McColgan
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/27/2023 3:00 AM CDT
Friday, September 22, 2023
Arrest of Felipe Angel Leal, Jr, filed. (LElizondo, 7)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
REMARK as to Felipe Angel Leal, Jr: MATERIAL WITNESSES CASE ASSIGNED TO CHIEF JUDGE RANDY CRANE, filed. (JanieLeyva, 7)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Criminal Complaint as to Felipe Angel Leal, Jr held on 9/25/2023. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Government moves for temporary detention and continuance to prepare for detention hearing. Court grants. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 9/27/2023 at 11:00AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S. Medrano. Material Witness Hearing set for 9/27/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano. (Time in Court: 9:19 - 9:52). Appearances: Theodore Parran, AUSA. (PTS: Daniel Canchola) (ERO: Christopher Barrera) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Monica S. Rossler/not used) (DUSM: Letty Torres) Deft remanded to custody. (CarmelRamirez, 7)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano: INITIAL APPEARANCE AND DETENTION HEARING OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES): Grebil Dorian Aguilar-Benitez and Gilmer Osmin Salazar-Avalos as to Felipe Angel Leal, Jr held on 9/25/2023. Material Witnesses informed of rights. The Court appointed counsel to represent the material witnesses, and counsel, Sandra I. Suarez, was present for the proceedings. The Government moved for detention. The Court heard from the parties regarding the issue of bond. Material Witnesses held without bond, since they are a flight risk and they have no legal status to be in the United States. Motions to take deposition of material witnesses to be filed. USMS to keep them safe and follow up on any medical needs...Material Witness Hearing set for 9/27/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano. (Time in Court: 9:59 - 10:05).Appearances: Theodore Parran, AUSA; Sandra I. Suarez, APPTD. (ERO: Chris Barrera) (PTS: Daniel Canchola)(Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Monica S. Rossler/used)(DUSM: Letty Torres). Material Witnesses remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal, filed.(CarmelRamirez, 7)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Melissa Evelia Lopez, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Felipe Angel Leal, Jr, filed.(Lopez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Felipe Angel Leal, Jr (1), filed. Initial Appearance set for 9/25/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano (AlmaGarcia, 7) (OmarOrta, 7).
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Gilmer Osmin Salazar-Avalos, Grebil Dorian Aguilar-Benitez as to Felipe Angel Leal, Jr Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 9/25/2023 at 09:01 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano, filed.(AlmaGarcia, 7) (OmarOrta, 7).
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Felipe Angel Leal, Jr (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (CarmelRamirez, 7)
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Felipe Angel Leal, Jr. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 9/27/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (CarmelRamirez, 7)
Related: [-]
5 5 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Felipe Angel Leal, Jr, filed.(LElizondo, 7)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Grebil Dorian Aguilar-Benitez. Sandra I Suarez appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (CarmelRamirez, 7)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Gilmer Osmin Salazar-Avalos. Sandra I Suarez appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (CarmelRamirez, 7)
Related: [-]
8 8 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Felipe Angel Leal, Jr, filed.
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION - MATERIAL WITNESS Gilmer Osmin Salazar-Avalos to the custody of the United States Marshal. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (XavierAvalos, 7)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION - MATERIAL WITNESS as to GREBIL DORIAN AGUILAR-BENITEZ ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (ChrisBarrera, 7)
Related: [-]