Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Craig S Denney
Case #: 3:23-cv-00472
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Terminated:Nov 25, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, November 25, 2024
18 18 order Judgment Mon 11/25 10:37 AM
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to ECF No.17 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 11/25/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ~Util - Terminate Case Mon 11/25 10:32 AM
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Mitchell Goodrum's failure to file an amended complaint in compliance with this Court's July 18 and October 15, 2024, orders. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. No other documents may be filed in this now-closed case. If Goodrum wishes to pursue his claims, he must file a complaint in a new case and either pay the required filing fee or apply for in forma pauperis status. It is further ordered that Goodrum's application to proceed in formapauperis ECF No.4 is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 11/25/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Reconsider Tue 10/15 10:33 AM
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that Goodrum's motion to file an objection (ECF No.14 ) is construed as a motion to reconsider the screening order, and it is denied in all respects. It is further ordered that Goodrum has until November 14, 2024 , to file a third amended complaint consistent with the Court's screening order (ECF No.10 ). Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/15/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
15 15 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 09/20 10:44 AM
MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to13 USCA Order re11 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mitchell Keith Goodrum. USCA Case No. 24-4827 . ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
14 14 motion Motion Reconsider Fri 09/06 10:06 AM
MOTION to File Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation , by Plaintiff Mitchell Keith Goodrum. Responses due by 9/20/2024. (DLS) (DJorder)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
13 13 appeal USCA Order Fri 08/30 10:27 AM
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to11 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mitchell Keith Goodrum. This appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. USCA Case No. 24-4827 . ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
12 12 appeal USCA Order Time Schedule Wed 08/07 12:25 PM
USCA TIME SCHEDULE ORDER and Docketing Notice as to ECF No.11 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 24-4827 assigned. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
11 11 appeal Notice Appeal Mon 08/05 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff Mitchell Keith Goodrum. Filing fee $605 not paid . E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for appeal can be found on the Court's website at [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (DLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
10 10 20 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Screening Order Thu 07/18 3:46 PM
SCREENING ORDER - A decision on the application to proceed IFP (ECF No.4 ) is deferred. The SAC (ECF No.6 ) is Goodrum's operative complaint. The motion for leave to file a certificate of credit (ECF No.7 ) is denied. Claims are dismissed as detailed herein. The State of Nevada, the U.S. District Court of Nevada, Carla Baldwin, Northern Nevada Correctional Center, Frank Berlado, and the NDOC are dismissed with prejudice from this action. Aaron Ford and Hendges are dismissed without prejudice from this action. Amended Complaint deadline: 8/19/2024. The Clerk of the Court must send Plaintiff Goodrum the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint, instructions for the same, and a copy of his Second Amended Complaint (ECF No.6 ). ( For Distribution by law library. ) Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 7/18/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SAC for P,
Att: 2 Complaint Forms
Thursday, May 30, 2024
notice Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Thu 05/30 2:10 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:23-cv-00472-ART-CSD . (no image attached) (GA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
notice Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Tue 02/06 9:23 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks for all further proceedings. Random transfer to adjust equitable caseload distribution. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:23-cv-00472-LRH-CSD . (no image attached) (AF) Modified on 2/6/2024 (AF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
7 7 motion Motion Leave to File Document/Excess Pages Wed 12/06 9:41 AM
MOTION for Leave to File a Certificate of Credit, by Plaintiff Mitchell Keith Goodrum. Responses due by 12/20/2023. (DLS) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
6 6 cmp Complaint Amended Tue 12/05 12:01 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, by Mitchell Keith Goodrum. Adds new parties. (GA)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
5 5 cmp Complaint Amended Mon 12/04 11:01 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Mitchell Keith Goodrum. Adds new parties. (GA)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
4 4 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/21 7:24 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Mitchell Keith Goodrum. (GA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
3 3 cmp Complaint Amended Wed 09/27 9:02 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Mitchell Keith Goodrum. No changes to parties. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Tue 09/26 9:31 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (GA)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Tue 09/26 9:20 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint