Original Case: 3:17-cv-01017

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-55805
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 21, 2025 5:03 AM PDT
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF IOWA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF NEBRASKA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF MISSOURI
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF KENTUCKY
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF OHIO
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF ALASKA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF IDAHO
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF MONTANA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Represented By
Jeremiah L. Morgan
William J. Olson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
JOHN CUTONILLI
Represented By
John Cutonilli
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
Represented By
Jeremiah L. Morgan
William J. Olson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
UNITED STATES CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, INC.
Represented By
Jeremiah L. Morgan
William J. Olson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
AMERICA'S FUTURE, INC.
Represented By
Jeremiah L. Morgan
William J. Olson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
TENNESSEE FIREARMS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Jeremiah L. Morgan
William J. Olson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
VIRGINIA CITIZENS DEFENSE LEAGUE
Represented By
Jeremiah L. Morgan
William J. Olson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
THE HELLER FOUNDATION
Represented By
Jeremiah L. Morgan
William J. Olson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
GUN OWNERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC.
Represented By
Jeremiah L. Morgan
William J. Olson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION
Represented By
Edward A. Paltzik
Bochner, PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae
GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
Jeremiah L. Morgan
William J. Olson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF WYOMING
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF VIRGINIA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
AGMT - Office of the Montana Attorney General (Helena)
contact info
Joshua N. Turner
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.
Represented By
David Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF ARIZONA
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF MAINE
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
NATIONAL SHOOTING SPORTS FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By
Noel John Francisco
Jones Day
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CENTER FOR HUMAN LIBERTY
Represented By
Joseph Greenlee
National Rifle Association of America
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CALIFORNIA GUN RIGHTS FOUNDATION
Represented By
Joseph Greenlee
National Rifle Association of America
contact info
Amicus Curiae
FPC ACTION FOUNDATION
Represented By
Joseph Greenlee
National Rifle Association of America
contact info
Amicus Curiae
EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY
Represented By
Priyanka Sen
Everytown Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
MARCH FOR OUR LIVES ACTION FUND
Represented By
Timothy Channing Hester
Covington & Burling, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By
Timothy Channing Hester
Covington & Burling, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By
Timothy Channing Hester
Covington & Burling, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF WISCONSIN
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF OREGON
Represented By
Amanda Hainsworth
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
ROB BONTA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By
John Darrow Echeverria
California Department of Justice
contact info
Mica Moore
AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Michael J. Mongan
California Department of Justice
contact info
Robert Meyerhoff
CA Dept of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
VIRGINIA DUNCAN
Represented By
Paul D. Clement
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Erin E. Murphy
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Matthew Rowen
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Anna Barvir
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Carl D. Michel
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Sean Anthony Brady
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CALIFORNIA RIFLE & PISTOL ASSOCIATION, INC., a California corporation
Represented By
Paul D. Clement
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Erin E. Murphy
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Matthew Rowen
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Anna Barvir
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Carl D. Michel
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Sean Anthony Brady
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHRISTOPHER WADDELL
Represented By
Paul D. Clement
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Erin E. Murphy
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Matthew Rowen
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Anna Barvir
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Carl D. Michel
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Sean Anthony Brady
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DAVID MARGUGLIO
Represented By
Paul D. Clement
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Erin E. Murphy
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Matthew Rowen
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Anna Barvir
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Carl D. Michel
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Sean Anthony Brady
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PATRICK LOVETTE
Represented By
Paul D. Clement
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Erin E. Murphy
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Matthew Rowen
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Anna Barvir
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Carl D. Michel
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info
Sean Anthony Brady
Michel & Associates, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/21/2025 5:02 AM PDT
Monday, September 25, 2023
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Rob Bonta Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/02/2023. Appellant Rob Bonta opening brief due 11/21/2023. Appellees California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Virginia Duncan, Patrick Lovette, David Marguglio and Christopher Waddell answering brief due 12/21/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12798334] (JBS) [Entered: 09/25/2023 01:07 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet