North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Robert T Numbers, II
Case #: 5:23-cv-00529
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 4:41 AM EDT
Defendant
NC 3116 Hillsborough LLC
Represented By
Patrick H. Flanagan
Cranfill Sumner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
William Ronnie Adams
Represented By
David J. Martin
David J. Martin PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/24 12:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by William Ronnie Adams (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
notice Notice to Counsel Tue 02/27 8:53 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding:8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The defendant has filed an answer to the complaint in this matter on 11/29/23 at6 . In order for the court to terminate this case, you must file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/26 11:38 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by William Ronnie Adams as to NC 3116 Hillsborough LLC. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
7 7 1 pgs discov Order for Discovery Plan Thu 11/30 9:35 AM
ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/30/2023. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/29 10:14 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by NC 3116 Hillsborough LLC. (Flanagan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/03 8:25 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint filed by NC 3116 Hillsborough LLC. (Flanagan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Fri 11/03 4:46 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 11/03 4:57 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time5 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including November 29, 2023, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/3/2023. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
notice Notice to Counsel Tue 10/10 10:10 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding:3 Notice of Appearance,4 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 08, 2023
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Sun 10/08 9:04 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by William Ronnie Adams (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 10/08 9:04 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by David J. Martin on behalf of William Ronnie Adams. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
utility Case Selected for Mediation Fri 10/06 3:54 PM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website,[LINK:www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx] . Please serve this list on all parties. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 09/29 3:22 PM
Summons Issued as to NC 3116 Hillsborough LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure Fri 09/29 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to William Ronnie Adams. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Fri 09/29 3:16 PM
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Fri 09/29 3:17 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" ( the civil cover sheet ) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 10:58 AM
COMPLAINT against NC 3116 Hillsborough LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7285583.), filed by William Ronnie Adams. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons