North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Referred: Brian S Meyers
Case #: 7:23-cv-01348
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Apr 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 6:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Mark Leon Eastham
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
Davis Hartman Wright LLP
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Matthew Shoaf
Defendant
Peter J. Spark
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
Davis Hartman Wright LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Paul Sharpe
245 Royal Fern Rd.
Wilmington, NC 28412


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 06, 2024
36 36 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/06 3:22 PM
ORDER regarding 35 MOTION for Clarification regarding Standing, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 5/4/2024. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
35 35 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/02 8:02 AM
MOTION for Clarification regarding Standing filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (Stouch, L.) (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 (5/1/2024) Exhibit 1 - Email
Monday, April 29, 2024
34 34 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Compel Mon 04/29 1:43 PM
ORDER: Defendants' motion to remand is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's motionsare DENIED AS MOOT. This action is REMANDED to the Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina, Case No. 22-02917 5-DMW. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 4/26/2024. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
33 33 motion Compel Fri 03/22 2:31 PM
MOTION to Compel Defendants to Answer Complaint, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
32 32 service Affidavit of Service Wed 03/13 11:14 AM
Proof of Service, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. Daniel M. Shoaf served on 3/8/2024. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
31 31 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/01 2:30 PM
MOTION for Hearing and Reissuance of Summons and Notice of Withdrawal of21 Motion to Amend Complaint, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Email Correspondence with Benjamin DuFour,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Email Correspondence with Timothy Brennan
Thursday, February 29, 2024
30 30 service Affidavit of Service Thu 02/29 3:32 PM
Proof of Service, filed by Daniel Matthew Shoaf. Summons and Complaint served on Daniel M. Shoaf via counsel on 2/29/2024. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
29 29 service Affidavit of Service Thu 02/29 3:30 PM
Proof of Service, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. Summons and Complaint served on Peter Spark and Mark Eastham via counsel on 2/29/2024. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
28 28 respm Response Mon 02/26 3:23 PM
Objection to26 Proposed Order regarding24 Amended MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
27 27 8 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Mon 02/26 3:22 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to24 Amended MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
26 26 respm Proposed Order Fri 02/23 1:18 PM
Proposed Order Amended Motion to Remand filed by Mark Leon Eastham, Peter J. Spark. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
25 25 6 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 02/23 1:14 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding24 Amended MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court filed by Mark Leon Eastham, Peter J. Spark. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Remand to Bankruptcy Court Fri 02/23 1:05 PM
Amended MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court filed by Mark Leon Eastham, Peter J. Spark. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
notice Notice of Deficiency Thu 02/22 4:00 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding22 Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court. This filing is deficient in the following ways: (1) counsel did not file a proposed order; (2) counsel's motion fails to comply with the judge's practice preferences as it relates to prior consultation with the opposing party and the views of opposing party within the motion; and (3) the memorandum of law in support of the motion should be filed as a separate document at a separate docket entry. On or before 2/25/2024, counsel is directed to refile the motion and memorandum in support using the appropriate events. Counsel is further directed to file a proposed order using the 'Proposed Order' event and link it back to the motion to which it corresponds. Counsel should also email the proposed order in a word processing format to Documents_Judge_Myers@nced.uscourts.gov. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/21 1:00 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by John C. Bircher, III on behalf of Mark Leon Eastham, Peter J. Spark. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Remand to Bankruptcy Court Wed 02/21 12:55 PM
MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court filed by Mark Leon Eastham, Peter J. Spark. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Wed 02/21 10:55 AM
Motion Submitted to Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding21 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint and MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
21 21 motion Amend/Correct Consolidate Cases Fri 02/16 1:36 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct, MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order Lifting Stay Thu 02/15 10:55 AM
ORDER LIFTING STAY. Plaintiff has 52 days remaining to properly serve Defendants. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 2/15/2024. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
19 19 respm Response to Order Mon 01/08 11:54 AM
Plaintiff's ANSWER/RESPONSE to18 Order on Ex Parte Motion for TRO, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Ex Parte Motion for TRO Fri 11/03 12:49 PM
ORDER Ex Parte denying 17 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Additionally, this matter is STAYED in the interest of judicial economy. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 11/3/2023. (Copy of order mailed to Robert Paul Sharpe 245 Royal Fern Rd, Wilmington, NC 28412.) (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
17 17 motion Ex Parte Motion for TRO Wed 11/01 2:22 PM
EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Hearing Tue 10/31 4:57 PM
ORDER denying 14 Motion for Status Conference. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 10/31/2023. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
15 15 misc Withdrawal of Motion Thu 10/26 3:40 PM
WITHDRAWAL of13 EX PARTE MOTION, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Hearing Thu 10/26 2:33 PM
MOTION for Status Conference, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Thu 10/26 2:35 PM
Motion Submitted to Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding14 MOTION for Status Conference. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
13 13 motion Ex Parte Motion Tue 10/24 2:22 PM
EX PARTE MOTION, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Ex Parte Motion Tue 10/24 10:03 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice 11 Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 10/23/2023. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing Tue 10/24 8:25 AM
Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
11 11 motion Ex Parte Motion Mon 10/23 3:34 PM
EX PARTE MOTION for Hearing and Motion for Injunctive Relief, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Document Mon 10/23 10:44 AM
Affidavit filed by Robert Paul Sharpe regarding8 Motion for Entry of Default. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Copy of Motion - Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Action
9 9 service Certificate of Service Mon 10/23 10:41 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Robert Paul Sharpe regarding8 MOTION for Entry of Default. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
8 8 motion Entry of Default Fri 10/20 4:07 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendants Peter J. Spark and Mark Leon Eastham, filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
notice Notice to Counsel Fri 10/20 4:18 PM
Notice to Plaintiff. On or before 10/27/2023, Plaintiff should file a certificate of service showing that the motion for entry of default was sent to defendants. (Copy of notice mailed to Robert Paul Sharpe, 245 Royal Fern Rd., Wilmington, NC 28412.) (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/02 3:27 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. Mark Eastham served on 9/27/2023. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/02 3:26 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. Peter Spark served on 9/27/2023. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/02 3:24 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. Daniel Shoaf served on 9/27/2023. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 09/27 8:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Mark Leon Eastham, Daniel Matthew Shoaf, Peter J. Spark. (Summons issued at intake) . (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 09/27 8:47 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Self-Representation Wed 09/27 8:46 AM
Notice of Self-Representation filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 8:45 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number 7-000000122), filed by Robert Paul Sharpe. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet