Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:23-cv-01521
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 3:03 AM PDT
Defendant
Morgan Lambardo
District Attorney's Office 200 Lewis Ave.
Las Vegas, NV 89155
Defendant
Marco Luna
309 S. 3rd Street
Las Vegas, NV 89101
Defendant
Glen O'Brien
200 Lewis Ave.
Las Vegas, NV 89155
Defendant
Police D. Rose
Las Vegas Metro Police 400 S. Martin L. King Boulevard
Las Vegas, NV 89106
Defendant
Julie Steps
Plaintiff
Roderick Hymon
631076 Clark County Detention Center 330 South Casino Center
Las Vegas, NV 89101


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, June 13, 2024
25 25 misc Mail Returned Fri 06/14 9:23 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re23 Order and24 Judgment, addressed to Roderick Hymon. Reason: "Attempted - Not Known." (RJDG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
24 24 order Judgment Thu 06/06 10:39 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Police D. Rose, Glen O'Brien, Julie Steps, Marco Luna and Morgan Lambardo against Plaintiff Roderick Hymon. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/6/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM) (Main Document 24 replaced on 6/6/2024) (MAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Order Dismissing Case Thu 06/06 10:17 AM
ORDER adopting21 Report and Recommendation and Dismissing case. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/5/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
22 22 misc Mail Returned Wed 05/29 4:34 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re21 Report and Recommendation, addressed to Roderick Hymon. Note: Unable to forward. (MAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
21 21 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 05/21 11:46 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is therefore recommended that this action is dismissed for failure to file an amended complaint by the court-ordered deadline, leaving no claims pending. Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/21/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
minord Minute Order Thu 04/11 5:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/11/2024. In light of ECF No. 19, Plaintiff is directed to update his address by 4/25/2024. Failure to do so may result in a recommendation that his case be dismissed. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ANS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
19 19 misc Mail Returned Mon 04/08 3:04 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re18 Order on Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1, addressed to Roderick Hymon. Note: Unable to forward. (MAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
18 18 4 pgs order Order on Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1 Wed 03/27 12:43 PM
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Roderick Hymons objections to and appeals of the magistrate judges order dismissing his complaint with leave to amend16 &17 are OVERRULED. The magistrate judges order4 is AFFIRMED. Hymon must file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies identified in this and the magistrate judges order by April 26, 2024. The failure to file an amended complaint by that deadline may result in the dismissal of this case without further prior notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Hymons requests for appointed counsel are also DENIED without prejudice. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
minord Minute Order Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel Mon 01/08 8:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/8/2024. ORDER denying12 Motion for Appointment of Counsel without prejudice. Plaintiff may renew his motion after the appeal at ECF Nos. 12 and 14 is resolved, or after he files an amended complaint. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ANS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
minord Minute Order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 11/21 10:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/21/2023. ORDER granting10 Motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of his complaint. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ANS)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
10 10 motion Motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/20 9:10 AM
MOTION to Request for Copy of Plaintiff's Complaint for Ninth Circuit Appeals by Plaintiff Roderick Hymon. Responses due by 12/1/2023. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
9 9 appeal USCA Order Mon 11/20 8:23 AM
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, DISMISSING6 Notice of Appeal, filed by Roderick Hymon. A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the October 18, 2023 magistrate judge order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
8 8 appeal USCA Order Time Schedule Mon 11/06 8:58 AM
USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to6 Notice of Appeal, filed by Roderick Hymon. USCA Case Number 23-3288 . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Case Number Assigned Mon 11/06 8:53 AM
USCA, Ninth Circuit Appellate Case Number 23-3288 assigned to6 Notice of Appeal. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
6 6 appeal Notice Appeal Tue 10/31 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to4 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, Screening Order,, by Plaintiff Roderick Hymon. Filing fee $ 505 - NOT PAID . E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
5 5 cmp Complaint Wed 10/18 12:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Morgan Lambardo, Marco Luna, Glen O'Brien, Police D. Rose, Julie Steps by Roderick Hymon. (CAH)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Screening Order Wed 10/18 12:51 PM
SCREENING ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis1 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court must file Plaintiffs complaint 1-1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs complaint be dismissed with leave to amend. The deadline to file an amended complaint is November 18, 2023. Failure to file by that deadline may result in the dismissal of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/18/2023. (copy of complaint sent to P) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
3 3 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/28 2:05 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roderick Hymon.(JQC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Wed 09/27 9:36 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Wed 09/27 9:33 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (JQC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint