Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-52125

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:23-ap-02061
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Apr 05, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Randall E Linsted
8025 Olentangy River Rd.
Columbus, OH 43235
Represented By
Randall E Linsted
contact info
Plaintiff
Akron Auto Auction Inc
2471 Ley Dr.
Akron, OH 44319
Represented By
Matthew R Duncan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, April 05, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 04/05 3:16 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:23-ap-2061 (dap)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/05 3:17 PM
Adversary Case 2:23-ap-2061 Closed (dap)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 17, 2023
9 9 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Mon 12/18 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 12/17/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)8 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, December 14, 2023
8 8 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 12/15 9:31 AM
Agreed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Compromise Compliant of Creditor, Akron Auto Auction, Inc. to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§523 (A) and 727 Related [+] (dap)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
7 7 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 12/06 4:18 PM
Agreed Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Randall E Linsted (Ditullio, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/25 5:24 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Randall E Linsted. (Ditullio, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
5 5 BNC Certificate of Mailing - BNC Sat 09/30 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/29/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)3 Order Regarding Deficient Filing
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
4 4 misc Substitute PDF Wed 09/27 3:56 PM
Substitute PDF Substitute Summons and Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Akron Auto Auction Inc Related [+]. (Duncan, Matthew)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued and Served,3 Order Regarding Deficient Filing
3 3 order Regarding Deficient Filing Wed 09/27 11:39 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing and Order Setting Deadline for Compliance Regarding: Related [+]. (dap)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued and Served
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
2 2 misc Summons Issued and Served Tue 09/26 3:29 PM
Summons(es) Issued and Served on Randall E Linsted on 9/26/2023, Answer due on 10/26/2023 (Duncan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/26 2:35 PM
Adversary case 2:23-ap-02061. (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)), (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))): Complaint by Akron Auto Auction Inc. against Randall E Linsted. Fee Amount $350 Complaint of Creditor, Akron Auto Auction, Inc. to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 523 and 727 (Duncan, Matthew) Modified to plaintiff's name to add Inc. on 9/27/2023 (dap)
Related: [-]