Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey L Schmehl
Case #: 5:23-cv-03751
Nature of Suit891 Other Statutes - Agricultural Acts
Cause07:181 Packers & Stockyard Act
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 10:49 AM EDT
Defendant
CH BUTCHER, INC.
334 ALBANY AVENUE
BROOKLYN, NY 11213
Defendant
BINYAMIN KABAKOV
IN THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES 1212 STERLING PLACE
BROOKLYN, NY 11213
Defendant
LEVI YITZCHAK KABAKOV
1086 LINCOLN PLACE
BROOKLN, NY 11213
Defendant
MEIR KABAKOV
749 EASTERN PARKWAY APT 303
BROOKLYN, NY 11213
Defendant
PASIFIC HALAL MEAT CORP.
1340 LINCOLN PLACE
BROOKLYN, NY 11213
Defendant
THE CROWN HEIGHTS MEAT STORE, INC.
411 TROY AVENUE
BROOKLYN, NY 11213
Plaintiff
HERSHEY SPRINGS FARM, LLC
Represented By
JUSTIN J. BOLLINGER
Gibbel Kraybill & Hess LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/02 10:58 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HERSHEY SPRINGS FARM, LLC. PASIFIC HALAL MEAT CORP. waiver sent on 4/28/2025, answer due 6/27/2025. (Davis, Kyle)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/02 10:57 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HERSHEY SPRINGS FARM, LLC. MEIR KABAKOV waiver sent on 4/28/2025, answer due 6/27/2025. (Davis, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Tue 04/29 5:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Anthony McCreath re: served Summons, Amended Complaint upon Crown Heights Mr. Aiv by personal service on 4/07/2025 (Davis, Kyle)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Tue 04/29 5:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Anthony McCreath re: served Summons, Amended Complaint upon Ms. Kabakov by personal service on 4/07/2025 (Davis, Kyle)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Tue 04/29 5:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Anthony McCreath re: served Summons, Amended Complaint upon Manager by personal service on 4/07/2025 (Davis, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 03/24 9:54 AM
(Amended Complaint ) Summons Issued as to CH BUTCHER, INC., BINYAMIN KABAKOV, LEVI YITZCHAK KABAKOV, MEIR KABAKOV, PASIFIC HALAL MEAT CORP., THE CROWN HEIGHTS MEAT STORE, INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 3/24/25 (er)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/21 11:15 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by HERSHEY SPRINGS FARM, LLC.(Davis, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/14 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Davis on behalf of HERSHEY SPRINGS FARM, LLC with Certificate of Service(Davis, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 09/28 1:20 PM
Summons Issued as to CH BUTCHER, INC., BINYAMIN KABAKOV, LEVI YITZCHAK KABAKOV, MEIR KABAKOV, PASIFIC HALAL MEAT CORP., THE CROWN HEIGHTS MEAT STORE, INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/28/23 (mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/27 2:27 PM
NOTICE by HERSHEY SPRINGS FARM, LLC (BOLLINGER, JUSTIN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 09/27 10:35 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16971814.), filed by HERSHEY SPRINGS FARMS, LLC.(BOLLINGER, JUSTIN) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/27/2023) (sbt). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/27/2023) (sbt). (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/27/2023) (sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Designation Form
misc Attorney Required Forms Wed 09/27 1:47 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Yes/No questions need to be answered. (sbt)
Related: [-]