Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah D Morrison
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:23-cv-03154
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Represented By
Abigail J. Barr
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Catherine L Strauss
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jodi Radabaugh
Represented By
Brian Richard Noethlich
Barkan Meizlish Derose, LLP
contact info
Robert E DeRose, II
Barkan Meizlish Derose Cox, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara J. Vernon
Represented By
Brian Richard Noethlich
Barkan Meizlish Derose, LLP
contact info
Robert E DeRose, II
Barkan Meizlish Derose Cox, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 24, 2025
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/24 12:11 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint) by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Barr, Abigail)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 01/27 11:23 AM
***Civil Case Terminated (kk2)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
18 18 misc Status Report Mon 01/13 10:31 PM
STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Jodi Radabaugh, Barbara J. Vernon, Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Barr, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
17 17 order Status Report Order Wed 12/11 3:37 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER - The parties are DIRECTED to file a JOINT WRITTEN STATUS REPORT on JANUARY 13, 2025, unless an appropriate dismissal entry has been filed prior to that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 11, 2024. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Wed 12/11 11:23 AM
Statistical Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Settlement Conference held on 12/10/2024. (agm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Wed 12/11 11:22 AM
Statistical Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Pre-Settlement Conference phone calls held on 12/9/2024. (agm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Setting Mediation Thu 10/31 12:06 PM
Order Setting Mediation Conference: Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura to conduct mediation in Room 172, 85 Marconi Boulevard, Columbus, Ohio. Mediation Hearing set for 12/10/2024 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/31/2024. (agm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 10/01 11:24 AM
Notation ORDER Granting14 Motion to Continue. Discovery due by 11/29/2024. Dispositive motions due by 12/30/2024. Parties will seek to mediate this case no later than January or February 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/1/2024. (sln)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation Mon 09/30 3:13 PM
STIPULATION and Request for Amended Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Jodi Radabaugh, Barbara J. Vernon. (DeRose, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 07/29 3:54 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Amend scheduling order. The current expert disclosure and rebuttal deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on July 29, 2024. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation Thu 07/25 5:25 PM
STIPULATION and Request for Amended Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jodi Radabaugh. (DeRose, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
11 11 30+ pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 12/15 4:15 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 15, 2023. (jlk)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 12/15 1:12 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Protective Order by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Barr, Abigail) Modified on 12/15/2023 (jlk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/01 3:58 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Barr, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
8 8 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Mon 11/20 2:41 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 1/15/2024. Joinder of Parties/Motions to Amend due by 2/29/2024. Discovery due by 9/30/2024. (If the parties are unable to reach an agreement on any matter related to discovery, they are directed to arrange a conference with the Court). Clawback Agreement Deadline due by 12/15/2023. Dispositive motions due by 10/31/2024. Primary Expert due by 7/31/2024. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/30/2024. Settlement Demand due by 11/15/2024. Response to Settlement Demand due by 11/29/2024. Mediation Deadline: 12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/20/2023. (vb)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation Mon 11/20 8:55 AM
STIPULATION to Move or Plead by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Barr, Abigail)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/20 10:17 AM
NOTICE : The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2023 is VACATED. (See ECF No.6 .) (sln)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
6 6 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 11/17 4:26 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT of the Parties by Plaintiffs Jodi Radabaugh, Barbara J. Vernon. (Noethlich, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 10/17 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2023 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/16 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail J. Barr for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association (Barr, Abigail)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/16 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine L Strauss for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association (Strauss, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/06 1:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association on 9/27/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (DeRose, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 1:43 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9619702), filed by Jodi Radabaugh, Barbara J. Vernon. (DeRose, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Right to Sue Letter - J. Radabaugh,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Right To Sue Letter - B. Vernon,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Letter of Determination - J. Radabaugh,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Letter of Determination - B. Vernon,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet