Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam A Lindsay
Case #: 3:23-cv-02155
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 4:03 AM CDT
Defendant
HSB Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Jennifer L Gibbs
Zelle LLP
contact info
Megan Elizabeth Zeller
Zelle LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CiCi Enterprises LP
Represented By
R Brent Cooper
Cooper & Scully PC
contact info
Julie Ann Shehane
Cooper & Scully PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
Michael Huddleston
Terminated: 02/12/2024


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
40 40 respm Appendix in Support Fri 05/16 2:16 PM
Appendix in Support filed by HSB Specialty Insurance Company re39 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Best, Mariana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Declaration of Lauren Kania,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A-1 Cyber Insurance Policy No. 6613789-01,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A-2 Claim Notes Regarding Sublimit Payment,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B - Plaintiff Cici Enterprises, LPs Responses to Defendant HSB Specialty Insurance Companys First Set of Requests for Admissions,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C - May 21, 2022 Email from Anthony Carrick to At-Bay,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) D - Ransomware Notice,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) E - Cicis June 10, 2022 FBIs Internet Crime Complaint,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) F - HSB Coverage Letter dated June 10, 2022
39 39 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Fri 05/16 2:12 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by HSB Specialty Insurance Company re38 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Best, Mariana)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/16 2:11 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HSB Specialty Insurance Company (Best, Mariana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 14, 2025
37 37 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/17 8:47 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for four-week docket beginning 12/1/2025 before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. Motions due by 7/21/2025. Discovery due by 7/7/2025. Pretrial Order due by 11/3/2025. Pretrial Materials due by 11/3/2025. Status Report due by 11/3/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 3/14/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
36 36 motion Continue Fri 03/07 8:40 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue filed by CiCi Enterprises LP (Cooper, R)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed Order on Second Joint Motion for Continuance
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
35 35 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/11 11:27 AM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 9/2/2025 before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. Motions due by 4/18/2025. Discovery due by 4/4/2025. Pretrial Order due by 8/5/2025. Pretrial Materials due by 8/5/2025. Status Report due by 8/5/2025. A pretrial conference in this case is set for 8/29/2025 02:30 PM before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/10/2024) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
34 34 motion Continue Mon 12/09 11:40 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial Deadlines and Trial Date filed by CiCi Enterprises LPAttorney Jennifer L Gibbs added to party CiCi Enterprises LP(pty:pla) (Gibbs, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 18, 2024
33 33 trial Designation of Experts Mon 11/18 6:28 PM
Designation of Experts by HSB Specialty Insurance Company. (Gibbs, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
32 32 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 11/04 12:51 PM
ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint,, filed by HSB Specialty Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Gibbs, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
31 31 sealex Sealed and/or Ex Parte Appendix/Brief/Memorandum in Support Tue 10/22 9:00 AM
(Document Restricted) Sealed Exhibit re:26 Designation of Experts filed by CiCi Enterprises LP. (cfk)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion Tue 10/22 8:56 AM
(Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting27 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit to Designation of Expert Witnesses and 26(a)(2) Disclosures. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/21/2024) (cfk)
Related: [-]
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/21 10:54 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against HSB Specialty Insurance Company filed by CiCi Enterprises LP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (agc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s)
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 10/21 9:44 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Leave to File. The clerk of the court shall file Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [20-1] as a separate entry on the docket sheet and have the docket sheet reflect that the pleading was filed as of the date of this order. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/21/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
27 27 motion Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion Fri 10/18 3:19 PM
(Document Restricted) Cici Enterprises, LPs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit to Designation of Expert Witnesses and 26(a)(2) Disclosures and Brief in Support (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by CiCi Enterprises LP (Shehane, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Proposed Order
26 26 trial Designation of Experts Fri 10/18 3:07 PM
Designation of Experts by CiCi Enterprises LP. (Shehane, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Appendix A to Martin Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Appendix B to Martin Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B - Brent Cooper CV
25 25 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 10/18 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mariana P Best on behalf of HSB Specialty Insurance Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Best, Mariana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/06 8:08 AM
ORDER: The court determines that the23 Motion should be, and is hereby, granted, to the extent herein set forth. Accordingly, the deadline for Plaintiff's Designation of Experts is 10/18/2024; the deadline for Defendant's Designation of Experts is 11/18/2024; and the deadline for Challenges to Experts is 1/16/2025. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/5/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation Tue 09/03 2:20 PM
Joint STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend Certain Scheduling Order Deadlines by CiCi Enterprises LP. (Cooper, R)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 23, 2024
22 22 14 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 08/23 3:37 PM
Special Order No. 3-354: Effective August 23, 2024, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Magistrate Judge Brian McKay and shall henceforth carry the suffix letters BW. This case has been reassigned pursuant to Special Order No. 3-354. (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge David C. Godbey on 8/23/2024) (mms)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
21 21 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Fri 08/02 11:37 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by CiCi Enterprises LP re20 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Cooper, R)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
20 20 motion Leave to File Fri 08/02 11:26 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by CiCi Enterprises LP (Cooper, R)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
19 19 28 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/22 1:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff CiCi Enterprises, LP's First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief against All Defendants filed by CiCi Enterprises LP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cooper, R)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
18 18 3 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency Wed 05/08 10:20 AM
Order and Notice of Deficiency: CiCi Enterprises LP must address the following deficiency: Jurisdiction. By 5/22/24, CiCi Enterprises LP must file an amended complaint that cures the jurisdictional deficiencies identified in this order. The amended allegations shall be limited to those necessary to address the jurisdictional deficiencies identified by the court. Failure to comply with this order and cure these deficiencies will result in the sua sponte dismissal without prejudice of this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 5/8/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
17 17 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 04/22 3:41 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Protective Order. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 4/22/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
16 16 motion Protective Order Thu 04/18 3:05 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Joint Motion for Entry of Confidentiality filed by HSB Specialty Insurance Company (Gibbs, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 04/18 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sheila Heath Waite on behalf of CiCi Enterprises LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Waite, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Mon 03/04 12:10 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by CiCi Enterprises LP. (Shehane, Julie)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
13 13 adr ADR Summary Mon 02/12 11:56 AM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by Michael Huddleston. Attorneys in Attendance: R. Brent Cooper, Julie Shehane, Jennifer Gibbs and Megan Zeller. Prv Fee: $ $3,600. Outcome of ADR: Parties were unable to reach a settlement. (Huddleston, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order For ADR Tue 12/05 10:01 AM
MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are to select or designate a mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 10/4/2024. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/4/2023) (ndt)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/05 9:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 5/5/2025 before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. Joinder of Parties due by 3/4/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2024. Motions due by 12/16/2024. Discovery due by 12/2/2024. Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2025. Pretrial Materials due by 4/7/2025. Status Report due by 3/4/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/4/2023) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
10 10 misc Status Report Thu 11/30 9:46 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT And Rule 26(f) filed by CiCi Enterprises LP. (Cooper, R)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
9 9 order Status Report Order Thu 11/09 4:17 PM
ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Attorney conference shall take place no later than November 27, 2023 Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2023. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/9/2023) (agc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/07 10:03 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by HSB Specialty Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Jennifer L Gibbs added to party HSB Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Gibbs, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Thu 11/02 2:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to HSB Specialty Insurance Company ; served on 10/17/2023. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 10/10 10:39 AM
Summons Reissued as to HSB Specialty Insurance Company. (cfk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
5 5 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Thu 09/28 10:02 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by CiCi Enterprises LP. (Cooper, R)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 09/27 3:31 PM
Summons Issued as to HSB Specialty Insurance Company. (agc)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Lindsay Wed 09/27 3:30 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 09/27 2:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CiCi Enterprises, LP. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Cooper, R)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 2:12 PM
COMPLAINT against HSB Specialty Insurance Company filed by CiCi Enterprises, LP. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-14063897) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cooper, R)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Cover Sheet