California Central District Court
Case #: 2:23-cv-08080
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:Sep 28, 2023
Case in other court:San Bernardino Superior Court, CIVSB2314654
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Vivian I. Orlando
Maynard Nexsen LLP
contact info
Alison J. Shilling
Maynard Nexsen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Beulah Stuart
15115 Bandera Way
Victorville, CA 92394


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 28, 2023
4 4 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Thu 09/28 2:12 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Margo A. Rocconi. New Case Number 5:23-cv-01989-JGB (MARx). (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 09/27 12:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Transamerica. (Orlando, Vivian)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/27 12:53 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Transamerica identifying Commonwealth General Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Orlando, Vivian)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 09/27 12:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVSB2314654 Receipt No: ACACDC-36117230 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Transamerica. (Attorney Vivian I. Orlando added to party Transamerica(pty:dft))(Orlando, Vivian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-I to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Declaration of Vivian I. Orlando ISO Transamerica Life Insurance Company's Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1-3 to Declaration of Vivian I. Orlando,
Att: 4 Declaration of Carla K. Duggan ISO Transamerica Life Insurance Company's Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4-5 to the Declaration of Carla K. Duggan,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service