Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:23-cv-01525
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 1:55 AM PDT
Defendant
7-Eleven Inc
Represented By
Michael Scott Orr
Call & Jensen, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Jeffrey D. Winchester
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
William Eddins
Represented By
David N Salmon
David Salmon & Associates, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Case Thu 02/13 11:36 AM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-entitled action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for want of prosecution pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) and Local Rule 41-1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is kindly instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/12/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
14 14 misc Notice 41-1 Dismissal Mon 01/06 11:28 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within 30 days, the Court will enter an order of dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 2/5/2025. (NEV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 03/27 3:30 PM
ORDER granting11 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/6/2024. Motions due by 9/5/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/27/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Wed 03/27 3:32 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
11 11 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 03/26 1:39 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff William Eddins. (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/25 3:29 PM
ORDER. To date, the parties have not filed a stipulated discovery plan as required by Local Rule 26-1(a). A joint proposed discovery plan must be filed by April 1, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/25/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
9 9 6 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/28 10:57 AM
ORDER granting8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Michael Scott Orr for 7-Eleven Inc and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Jeffrey D. Winchester. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/27/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
8 8 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Mon 02/26 2:34 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael S. Orr and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeffrey D. Winchester (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7598961) by Defendant 7-Eleven Inc. (Winchester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 02/06 3:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 7-Eleven Inc that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Seven & i Holdings Co., Ltd., a Japanese corporation, Corporate Parent Seven-Eleven Japan Co. Ltd., Corporate Parent SEJ Asset Management & Investment Company for 7-Eleven Inc added. (Winchester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/06 3:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by 7-Eleven Inc. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/16/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/22/2024.(Winchester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
5 5 misc Affidavit Tue 10/03 2:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service re1 Complaint,,3 Summons Issued by Plaintiff William Eddins.. (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 09/28 11:38 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to 7-Eleven Inc re1 Complaint. (CT)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 09/28 11:27 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (CT)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Thu 09/28 12:47 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 09/27 2:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by William Eddins. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT against 7-Eleven Inc (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7441158) by William Eddins. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/7/2023. Proof of service due by 12/26/2023. (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons