North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Brian S Meyers
Case #: 7:23-cv-01355
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:402 Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:Feb 23, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 06/05 3:30 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/5/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] znick, Debra
Friday, May 31, 2024
utility Motion Submitted Fri 05/31 2:46 PM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding16 MOTION for Attorney Fees. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation Thu 04/11 2:09 PM
STIPULATION regarding16 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Martin O'Malley (Parson, Cassia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/11 2:08 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Cassia W. Parson on behalf of Martin O'Malley. (Parson, Cassia)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
16 16 motion Attorney Fees Fri 03/22 5:32 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Anna Elise Shuford Copeland. (O'Brien, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Statutory Maximum Rates Under the Equal Access to Justice Act,
Att: 2 Exhibit DOJ Attorney Fee Matrix,
Att: 3 Affidavit Time Spent in Support of EAJA Fees,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order For Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA 28 U.S.C.2412 (d),
Att: 5 Exhibit Plaintiffs Assignment of EAJA Fees
Friday, February 23, 2024
15 15 order Judgment Fri 02/23 4:08 PM
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Court hereby reverses the Commissioner's decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remands the case to the Commissioner for further proceedings. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/23/2024. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Fri 02/23 3:49 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/23/2024. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Fri 02/23 7:21 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding12 Consent MOTION to Remand Under Sentence Four . (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
13 13 respoth Memorandum in Support Thu 02/22 10:05 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding12 Consent MOTION to Remand Under Sentence Four filed by Martin O'Malley. (Mason, Wanda)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Remand Thu 02/22 10:04 PM
Consent MOTION to Remand Under Sentence Four filed by Martin O'Malley. (Mason, Wanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 09, 2024
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Fri 02/09 9:45 AM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 Social Security Plaintiff's Brief. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/09 10:43 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time11 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including March 11, 2024, within which to file Defendant's Social Security Brief. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/9/2024. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/08 4:49 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 Social Security Plaintiff's Brief filed by Martin O'Malley. (Mason, Wanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
10 10 motion Social Security Plaintiff Brief Tue 01/09 4:19 PM
Social Security Plaintiff's Brief (O'Brien, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
9 9 notice Notice-other Mon 12/11 4:22 PM
Notice to Parties Regarding Briefing Under the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions and Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Form
8 8 answer Transcripts - Social Security Case Mon 12/11 2:47 PM
Transcripts - Social Security Case (Zeiler, Samantha)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/11 2:44 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Samantha Zeiler on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Zeiler, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/13 8:46 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Wanda D. Mason on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Mason, Wanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/10 8:17 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 10/8/2023. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
service Notice of Social Security Case Service Tue 10/10 8:18 AM
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE SERVICE - This action is governed by the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Pursuant to Supplemental Rule 3, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate office within the Social Security of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of this case and Plaintiff's complaint. No summons will issue. Defendant's deadline to serve an answer or motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 is governed by Supplemental Rule 4. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
utility Motion Submitted Mon 10/02 10:23 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 09/27 3:39 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Anna Elise Shuford Copeland (O'Brien, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/27 3:37 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Cheryl A. O'Brien on behalf of Anna Elise Shuford Copeland. (O'Brien, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/27 3:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Anna Elise Shuford Copeland. (O'Brien, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Anna Elise Shuford Copeland. (O'Brien, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet