Nevada District Court
Judge:James C Mahan
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier, III
Case #: 2:23-cv-01528
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 1:56 AM PDT
Defendant
Store Master Funding III, LLC
Represented By
James R. Olson
Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski
contact info
Plaintiff
William Eddins
Represented By
David N Salmon
David Salmon & Associates, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, October 11, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case Tue 10/15 11:35 AM
ORDER granting16 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE. Each party to bear its own legal fees and expenses. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/11/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
16 16 motion Stipulation Thu 10/10 2:19 PM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Plaintiff William Eddins. (Salmon, David) (dismiss)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
order Standing Order Mon 08/19 1:34 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. Judge Couvillier's Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
minutes Discovery Hearing Tue 07/02 10:50 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Discovery Hearing held on 7/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro ; Pla Counsel: David Salmon ; Def Counsel: Paterno Jurani ; Recording start and end times: 10:17 am - 10:21 am ; Courtroom: 3B ; The court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel regarding the status of discovery. Counsel is advised that any future extension of discovery is unlikely. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 05/20 10:51 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Store Master Funding III, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Gormley, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Mon 04/01 11:11 AM
ORDER. Due to a scheduling conflict, the June 12, 2024 Discovery Status Hearing (ECF No.11 ) is rescheduled for July 2, 2024 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 3B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 4/1/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/12 4:54 PM
ORDER. Discovery Hearing set for 6/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 1/12/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
10 10 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 01/12 4:42 PM
ORDER granting8 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/3/2024. Motions due by 11/4/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 1/12/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
notice MDC - Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Mon 01/08 3:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01528-JCM-MDC . (no image attached) (LG)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
8 8 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 01/05 9:35 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff William Eddins.. (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/04 10:15 AM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties must submit a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order on or before January 19, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/4/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 11/03 4:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Store Master Funding III, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Olson, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/03 4:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand Defendant Store Master Funding II, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (Jury Demand) filed by Store Master Funding III, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/13/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/18/2023.(Olson, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
4 4 misc Affidavit Tue 10/03 2:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service re3 Summons Issued,1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff William Eddins.. (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 09/28 2:14 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Store Master Funding III, LLC re1 Complaint. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 09/27 3:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by William Eddins. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 3:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Store Master Funding III, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7441571) by William Eddins. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/7/2023. Proof of service due by 12/26/2023. (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 09/28 2:11 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (AMMi)
Related: [-]