Molda v. Kijakazi
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01529 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER Granting21 Motion for Attorney Fees. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the stipulation to award Plaintiff $9,542.52 in attorneys' fees pursuant to the EAJA, as well as $402 in costs pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1920. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/1/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF. CC: Finance. - RJDG) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Breann Marie Molda. (Postjudgment) Responses due by 4/24/2024.(Moran, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() JUDGMENT in favor of Breann M. against Martin O'Malley reversing the final decision of the Commissioner. Case closed. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER Denying as moot16 Plaintiff's Brief, Denying as moot17 Motion to Extend Time, and Granting18 Stipulation to Remand. The Clerk's Office is instructed to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/11/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG) |
|
18 | 18
![]() STIPULATION TO REMAND pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Gonzalez, Oscar) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re16 Plaintiff Brief - for social security cases only by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Responses due by 3/25/2024. (Gonzalez, Oscar) (sumjgm) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by Plaintiff Breann Marie Molda. Responses due by 3/6/2024. (Moran, John) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff Breann Marie Molda. Responses due by 2/13/2024.(Moran, John) (sumjgm) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Tue 01/30 12:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/30/2024. Pending before the Court is a motion for excess pages, Docket No. 14, which is GRANTED. The opening brief may be up to 32 pages in length. The Court also permits the Commissioner's brief to be up to 32 pages in length. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) |
||
Tuesday, January 09, 2024 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Tue 01/09 1:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/9/2024. Pending before the Court is a stipulation to extend nunc pro tunc , Docket No. 12, which is GRANTED as a one-time courtesy to counsel. The deadline to file the opening brief is EXTENDED to February 5, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) |
||
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re9 Certified Administrative Record by Plaintiff Breann Marie Molda. Responses due by 1/22/2024.(Moran, John) (dispositive) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER granting10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney John James Moran for Breann Marie Molda and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Hal Taylor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/16/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Second MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John James Moran and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7495263) by Plaintiff Breann Marie Molda.(Taylor, Hal) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (CAR) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Electronic access to the CAR is restricted to case participants only.) (Welsh, Blaine) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Manual Filing by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.,, Description: Social Security Administrative Record, manually filed with the Magistrate Judge's chambers. (Welsh, Blaine) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Blaine T Welsh on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Welsh, Blaine) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Oscar Gonzalez on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Gonzalez, Oscar) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (EDS) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ORDER Denying without prejudice3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 09/29 9:33 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RGDG) |
||
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel S. Jones and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7441705) by Plaintiff Breann Marie Molda.(Taylor, Hal) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Breann Marie Molda. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Taylor, Hal) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7441611) by Breann Marie Molda. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/7/2023. Proof of service due by 12/26/2023. CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. In accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. section 636(c), I voluntarily consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all further proceedings in this case, including entry of final judgment. I understand that appeal from the judgment shall be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (Taylor, Hal) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |