Nevada District Court
Judge:Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:23-cv-01529
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:Mar 11, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, July 01, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Mon 07/01 4:19 PM
ORDER Granting21 Motion for Attorney Fees. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the stipulation to award Plaintiff $9,542.52 in attorneys' fees pursuant to the EAJA, as well as $402 in costs pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1920. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/1/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF. CC: Finance. - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
21 21 motion Motion Attorney Fees Wed 04/10 9:22 AM
Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Breann Marie Molda. (Postjudgment) Responses due by 4/24/2024.(Moran, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
20 20 order Judgment Wed 03/13 9:33 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Breann M. against Martin O'Malley reversing the final decision of the Commissioner. Case closed. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Plaintiff Brief (social security) Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Mon 03/11 4:01 PM
ORDER Denying as moot16 Plaintiff's Brief, Denying as moot17 Motion to Extend Time, and Granting18 Stipulation to Remand. The Clerk's Office is instructed to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/11/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Stipulation Mon 03/11 5:50 AM
STIPULATION TO REMAND pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Gonzalez, Oscar)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 03/11 5:25 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re16 Plaintiff Brief - for social security cases only by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Responses due by 3/25/2024. (Gonzalez, Oscar) (sumjgm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
16 16 motion Plaintiff Brief (for social security cases only) Mon 02/05 5:53 AM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by Plaintiff Breann Marie Molda. Responses due by 3/6/2024. (Moran, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
14 14 motion Motion Leave to File Document/Excess Pages Tue 01/30 7:59 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff Breann Marie Molda. Responses due by 2/13/2024.(Moran, John) (sumjgm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of service
minord Minute Order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 01/30 12:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/30/2024. Pending before the Court is a motion for excess pages, Docket No. 14, which is GRANTED. The opening brief may be up to 32 pages in length. The Court also permits the Commissioner's brief to be up to 32 pages in length. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Tue 01/09 1:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/9/2024. Pending before the Court is a stipulation to extend nunc pro tunc , Docket No. 12, which is GRANTED as a one-time courtesy to counsel. The deadline to file the opening brief is EXTENDED to February 5, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
12 12 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 01/08 11:24 AM
MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re9 Certified Administrative Record by Plaintiff Breann Marie Molda. Responses due by 1/22/2024.(Moran, John) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of service
Thursday, November 16, 2023
11 11 8 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/16 3:01 PM
ORDER granting10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney John James Moran for Breann Marie Molda and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Hal Taylor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/16/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
10 10 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Wed 11/15 4:12 PM
Second MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John James Moran and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7495263) by Plaintiff Breann Marie Molda.(Taylor, Hal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cert.Good.Stand. NY,
Att: 2 Exhibit List Bar Memberships
9 9 misc Certified Administrative Record Wed 11/15 12:16 PM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (CAR) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Electronic access to the CAR is restricted to case participants only.) (Welsh, Blaine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Vol. 1
8 8 notice Notice Manual Filing in SS Appeal Case Wed 11/15 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Manual Filing by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.,, Description: Social Security Administrative Record, manually filed with the Magistrate Judge's chambers. (Welsh, Blaine)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Wed 11/15 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Blaine T Welsh on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Welsh, Blaine)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
6 6 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Fri 10/13 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Oscar Gonzalez on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Gonzalez, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
5 5 misc Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in SS Case Mon 10/02 5:20 PM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (EDS)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/02 11:45 AM
ORDER Denying without prejudice3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 09/29 9:33 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RGDG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
3 3 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Wed 09/27 4:04 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel S. Jones and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7441705) by Plaintiff Breann Marie Molda.(Taylor, Hal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cdrtificate of Good Standing EDNY,
Att: 2 Exhibit Cert.goodStand.NJ,
Att: 3 Exhibit Court Admissions List
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 09/27 3:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Breann Marie Molda. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Taylor, Hal)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 3:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7441611) by Breann Marie Molda. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/7/2023. Proof of service due by 12/26/2023. CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. In accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. section 636(c), I voluntarily consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all further proceedings in this case, including entry of final judgment. I understand that appeal from the judgment shall be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (Taylor, Hal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS