Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:23-cv-01530
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Case in other court:District Court - Clark County, A-23-876769-C
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 1:56 AM PDT
Defendant
The Travelers Indemnity Company 89169
Represented By
John Robert Hanson
Worthe Hanson & Worthe
contact info
Plaintiff
Alison Mullaney
Represented By
Joseph A. Gutierrez
Maier Gutierrez & Associates
contact info
Stephen Clough
Maier Gutierrez & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, December 09, 2024
58 58 respm Reply Mon 12/09 3:59 PM
REPLY to Response to44 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Defendant The Travelers Indemnity Company.(Hanson, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of John R. Hanson,
Att: 2 Exhibit I to Declaration of John R. Hanson,
Att: 3 Exhibit J to Declaration of John R. Hanson
Monday, December 02, 2024
57 57 misc Appendix Mon 12/02 6:49 PM
APPENDIX IX to48 Response by Plaintiff Alison Mullaney. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
56 56 misc Appendix Mon 12/02 6:48 PM
APPENDIX VIII to48 Response by Plaintiff Alison Mullaney. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
55 55 misc Appendix Mon 12/02 6:43 PM
APPENDIX VII to48 Response by Plaintiff Alison Mullaney. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
54 54 misc Appendix Mon 12/02 6:42 PM
APPENDIX VI to48 Response by Plaintiff Alison Mullaney. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
53 53 misc Appendix Mon 12/02 6:41 PM
APPENDIX V to48 Response by Plaintiff Alison Mullaney. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
52 52 misc Appendix Mon 12/02 6:26 PM
APPENDIX IV to48 Response by Plaintiff Alison Mullaney. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
51 51 misc Appendix Mon 12/02 6:26 PM
APPENDIX III to48 Response by Plaintiff Alison Mullaney. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
50 50 misc Appendix Mon 12/02 6:25 PM
APPENDIX II to48 Response by Plaintiff Alison Mullaney. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
49 49 misc Appendix Mon 12/02 6:24 PM
APPENDIX I to48 Response by Plaintiff Alison Mullaney. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
48 48 respm Response Mon 12/02 6:23 PM
RESPONSE to44 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Plaintiff Alison Mullaney. Replies due by 12/16/2024. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]