Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:23-cv-01531
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:Jul 08, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
11 11 order Judgment Tue 07/09 2:49 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Gabriel Najera and Karissa Currier against Matthew A. Coleman. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 7/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 07/09 2:45 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. No other documents may be filed in this now-closed case. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue his claims, he must file a complaint and satisfy the matter of the filing fee in a new case. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
9 9 cmp Complaint Mon 06/03 2:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Karissa Currier, Gabriel Najera (Filing fee $405 - NOT PAID) by Matthew A. Coleman. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
8 8 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Screening Order Mon 06/03 2:09 PM
SCREENING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the4 motion for extension of time and5 application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a non-prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days from the date of this order, Plaintiff must either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis for non-prisoners; or (2) pay the full filing fee of $402. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that if Plaintiff does not timely satisfy the matter of the filing fee, dismissal of this action may result. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court file the 5 -1 Complaint and correct the spelling of the defendant's name from "Nojera" to "Najera" on the docket sheet. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies of his Complaint, as outlined in this order, Plaintiff will file the amended complaint within 30 days from the date of entry of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court will send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a § 1983 complaint, instructions for the same, and a copy of his 5 -1 Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies outlined in this order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice for failure to state a claim. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/31/2024. (copy of complaint sent to P) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Non-Inmate,
Att: 2 Civil Complaint Form
Thursday, May 09, 2024
7 7 notice Notice Change of Address Fri 05/10 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Matthew A. Coleman. Address updated to 1001 North 4th Street Las Vegas, NV 89101. (JQC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
6 6 notice Notice Change of Address Wed 12/06 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Matthew A. Coleman. Old address SDCC. New address HDSP at 22010 Cold Creek Rd, Indian Springs, NV 89070. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
5 5 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/15 2:46 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Matthew A. Coleman.(GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
Thursday, October 26, 2023
4 4 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Thu 10/26 12:03 PM
MOTION to Extend Time re ECF No.3 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Matthew A. Coleman. Responses due by 11/9/2023. (GA) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/04 9:36 AM
ORDER Denying without prejudice1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than 12/1/2023, Plaintiff must either pay the full $402 filing fee or file a new fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/3/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP/Instructions
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Wed 09/27 3:58 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (GA)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/27 3:55 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Matthew A. Coleman.(GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons