Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier, III
Case #: 2:23-cv-01533
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:May 28, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 1:57 AM PDT
Defendant
ADI Family, LLC
Plaintiff
William Eddins
Represented By
David N Salmon
David Salmon & Associates, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 05/28 7:59 AM
Civil Case Terminated per10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (HAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 27, 2024
10 10 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Mon 05/27 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff William Eddins. (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/19 3:59 PM
ORDER for the Filing of Settlement Documents and Proposed Stipulation and Order for Dismissal by 5/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 4/19/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ABG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
8 8 misc Response Order to Show Cause Wed 04/17 2:45 PM
RESPONSE to6 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff William Eddins. (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
7 7 notice Notice Other Tue 04/16 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by William Eddins. (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Show Cause Tue 04/09 4:46 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff must SHOW CAUSE in writing, no later than 4/17/2024 why the defendant ADI Family, LLC should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 4/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
notice MDC - Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Mon 01/08 3:30 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01533-JAD-MDC . (no image attached) (LG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
4 4 misc Affidavit Tue 10/03 2:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service re1 Complaint,,3 Summons Issued by Plaintiff William Eddins.. (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 09/28 3:11 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ADI Family, LLC re1 Complaint. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 09/27 4:31 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by William Eddins. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 4:30 PM
COMPLAINT against ADI Family, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7441760) by William Eddins. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/7/2023. Proof of service due by 12/26/2023. (Salmon, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 09/28 3:07 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (AMMi)
Related: [-]