Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:23-cv-01535
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:Dec 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 1:57 AM PDT
Defendant
Walmart, Inc
Hall & Evans, LLC 1160 N Town Center Dr., Suite 330
Las Vegas, NV 89144
Represented By
Tanya Marie Fraser
Alverson Taylor & Sanders
contact info
Kurt R. Bonds
Hall & Evans, LLC
contact info
Madison Michelle Aguirre
Alverson Taylor & Sanders
contact info
Plaintiff
Lourdes Nader
Markman Law 4484 S. Pecos Rd Ste. 130
Las Vegas, NV 89121
Represented By
David A Markman
Markman Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, December 13, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Fri 12/13 1:03 PM
ORDER granting18 Stipulation for Dismissal of all Claims with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
18 18 motion Stipulation Thu 12/12 1:28 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of All Claims with Prejudice by Defendant Walmart, Inc. (Bonds, Kurt) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 10/11 3:25 PM
ORDER granting16 Stipulated Protective Order. See order for the following modifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/11/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
16 16 motion Stipulation Thu 10/10 2:07 PM
STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by Defendant Walmart, Inc. (Bonds, Kurt) (other) (protective)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
14 14 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 07/01 3:53 PM
ORDER granting13 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/20/2025. Motions due by 4/21/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/21/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/1/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Mon 07/01 3:54 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
13 13 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 06/28 11:46 AM
Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Walmart, Inc. (Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
minord Minute Order Mon 06/03 12:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/3/2024. Before the Court is Defendant Walmart, Inc.'s 11 Brief in response to the Court's 10 Order requiring Defendant to show cause how the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. section 1332 is met. The Court has reviewed Defendant's 11 Brief and is satisfied that the amount in controversy requirement is met. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will retain jurisdiction over this matter. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JD)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
11 11 respm Brief Fri 03/22 3:15 PM
BRIEF by Defendant Walmart, Inc. to Show Cause That Amount in Controversy Exceeds $75,000.00(Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, December 18, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 12/18 2:24 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.8 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. The parties must file a proposed discovery plan fourteen days after the Court lifts the stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
8 8 motion Stipulation Fri 12/15 2:52 PM
STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY re6 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Lourdes Nader. (Markman, David) (stay) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
7 7 respm Response Mon 11/13 4:57 PM
RESPONSE to6 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Walmart, Inc. Replies due by 11/20/2023.(Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, October 27, 2023
6 6 motion Motion Remand to State Court Fri 10/27 4:19 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Lourdes Nader. Responses due by 11/10/2023. (Markman, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
5 5 misc Statement in Removal Case Fri 10/13 2:22 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Walmart, Inc..(Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Thursday, September 28, 2023
3 3 minord Minute Order Removal Case Thu 09/28 12:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/28/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/13/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 09/28 12:36 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (CT)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Thu 09/28 12:49 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 09/27 4:39 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walmart, Inc. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Wed 09/27 4:35 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-23-873849-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7441791) by Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/7/2023. (Bonds, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F