Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Roy B Dalton, Jr
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:23-cv-01869
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Eastern Florida State College Board of Trustees
1519 Clearlake Rd.
Cocoa, FL 32922
Represented By
Melissa Christine Mihok
Private Corporate Counsel
contact info
Howard Michael Waldman
contact info
Mark E. Levitt
Ford Harrison
contact info
Mediator
Deborah Brown
4444 S. Rio Grand Avenue Apt. 516-D
Orlando, FL 32809
Represented By
Deborah C. Brown
Brown Law And Consulting, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Islam "Sal" Shimy
Represented By
Melissa Christine Mihok
Private Corporate Counsel
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
37 37 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 05/06 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RPB)
Related: [-]
36 36 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/06 11:13 AM
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re 35 Joint Notice of Settlement. All pending motions are denied as moot and all deadlines and hearings are terminated. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/5/2025. (EAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
35 35 notice Notice of settlement Fri 05/02 1:49 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Eastern Florida State College Board of Trustees (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
34 34 adr Mediation report Fri 05/02 11:38 AM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on April 28, 2025. Hearing outcome: Settled. (Kolin, Lawrence) Modified on 5/2/2025 to edit docket text (MSN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/22 6:40 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memoran filed by Islam "Sal" Shimy. (Mihok, Melissa)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/22 6:38 PM
NOTICE by Islam "Sal" Shimy re30 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Filing Transcript in Support of Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment(Mihok, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition transcript of Dedra Sibley
Friday, April 11, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Fri 04/11 12:41 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 4/28/25 12:00 PM before Lawrence Kolin. (Mihok, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
30 30 motion Summary Judgment Tue 04/01 2:03 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eastern Florida State College Board of Trustees.(Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit Exhibit 23
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
29 29 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 03/18 12:49 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/18/2025. (SWG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 03/17 1:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Eastern Florida State College Board of Trustees. (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion for Reconsideration / Clarification Thu 03/13 11:13 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying Plaintiff's 26 Motion to Forego In-Person Mediation. The mediation deadline is extended to Wednesday, April 30, 2025, and the parties are directed to conduct an in-person mediation by that date. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/13/2025. (SWG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
26 26 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/12 11:53 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Reconsider Order to Second In Person Mediation by Islam "Sal" Shimy. (Mihok, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/11 11:12 AM
NOTICE by Islam "Sal" Shimy of Change of Address (Mihok, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
24 24 adr Mediation report Tue 02/25 5:57 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on 2/25/25. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Brown, Deborah)
Related: [-]
23 23 adr Mediation report Tue 02/25 5:51 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on 2/25/25. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Brown, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Fri 02/21 11:52 AM
SECOND AMENDED NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 02/25/25 before Deborah C. Brown. (Levitt, Mark) Modified on 2/21/2025 to edit docket text (JDR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Wed 07/10 4:28 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on February 25, 2025, at 1:00 p.m before Deborah C. Brown. (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Fri 03/08 12:07 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on February 25, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. before Deborah Brown. (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
19 19 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 02/22 2:33 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2024, Joinder of Parties due by 5/1/2024, Discovery due by 2/28/2025, Dispositive motions due by 4/1/2025, Pretrial statement due by 8/4/2025, All other motions due by 7/31/2025, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/31/2024, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/30/2025, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2025 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for term commencing 9/2/2025 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/14/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/22/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
18 18 misc Case Management Report Thu 02/15 8:29 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order directing compliance Thu 02/01 4:15 PM
It is ORDERED that the parties are DIRECTED to file a joint Case Management Report no later than February 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/1/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
16 16 utility *Remark Tue 12/19 9:30 AM
Remark: Doc.14 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/19/2023. (JWG)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/18 1:42 PM
NOTICE by Eastern Florida State College Board of Trustees (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/18 1:39 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Eastern Florida State College Board of Trustees. (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/18 1:37 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Eastern Florida State College Board of Trustees.(Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of appearance Mon 12/18 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Michael Waldman on behalf of Eastern Florida State College Board of Trustees (Waldman, Howard)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 12/18 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Mark E. Levitt on behalf of Eastern Florida State College Board of Trustees. Lead Counsel: Mark E. Levitt. (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
10 10 service Waiver of service executed Wed 11/01 2:06 AM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 10/18/23 by Islam "Sal" Shimy as to Eastern Florida State College Board of Trustees.(Mihok, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons
Monday, October 16, 2023
9 9 utility *Remark Mon 10/16 9:57 AM
Remark: Doc.8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/16/2023. (JWG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 10/10 1:25 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Islam "Sal" Shimy. (Mihok, Melissa)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 10/10 1:24 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Islam "Sal" Shimy. Related case(s): No (Mihok, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
6 6 13 pgs order Order Tue 10/03 3:44 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/3/2023. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
5 5 order Standing Order Mon 10/02 12:04 PM
STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 09/29 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Melissa Christine Mihok on behalf of Islam "Sal" Shimy. Lead Counsel: Melissa C. Mihok. (Mihok, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 09/28 11:59 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa Christine Mihok of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPM)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/28 8:08 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:23-cv-01869-RBD-DCI. (AM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 5:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Eastern Florida State College Board of Trustees with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21298461) filed by Eastern Florida State College Board of Trustees.(Mihok, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet