Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 3:23-cv-00875
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Jan 11, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 28, 2023 11:15 PM EDT
Defendant
Jason English
Defendant
John Galipeau
Defendant
Westville Correctional Subordanates
Plaintiff
Dominique D Steele
181166 Westville Correctional Facility 5501 South 1100 West
Westville, IN 46391


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
28 28 misc Mail Returned Wed 09/11 12:14 PM
Mail Returned from Dominique D Steele as Undeliverable -27 Order. Envelope Marked: PD2 - Released, Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/06 11:34 AM
ORDER: The Court takes no action re26 Letter filed by Dominique D Steele as outlined. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 8/5/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
26 26 misc Letter Mon 03/25 4:14 PM
Letter to Judge Brady from Dominique D Steele. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (nhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
25 25 misc Clerks Judgment Fri 01/12 12:35 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
24 24 5 pgs order Opinion and Order Order Dismissing Case Fri 01/12 12:32 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: The court DISMISSES the second amended complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915A because it fails to state any claims upon which relief can be granted. The clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 01/11/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
23 23 service Proposed Summons Tue 01/09 9:46 AM
Proposed Summons filed by Dominique D Steele.(shk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
22 22 misc Letter Tue 01/09 9:45 AM
Letter from Dominique Steele to Judge Brady (no case number listed on document). (shk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, December 15, 2023
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/15 1:30 PM
***Deficiency Deadline and Amended Pleadings Deadline terminated. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/13 3:51 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jason English, John Galipeau, Westville Correctional Subordanates, filed by Dominique D Steele. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (nhc)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Letter Wed 12/13 3:10 PM
Letter from Dominique D Steele. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (no case number included in filing). (nhc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
19 19 service Proposed Summons Thu 12/07 2:05 PM
Proposed Summons filed by Dominique D Steele.(shk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
18 18 3 pgs order Opinion and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 11/28 11:09 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: The court GRANTS Dominique D. Steele until 1/2/2024, to file a second amended complaint on the courts approved form as described above; and CAUTIONS Dominique D. Steele if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915A without further notice because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 11/28/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (sej)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
17 17 cmp Pro Se Complaint Wed 11/22 1:26 PM
AMENDED PRO SE COMPLAINT against Jason English, John Galipeau, Westville Correctional Subordanates, filed by Dominique D Steele. (file stamped copy mailed to pro se plaintiff)(rmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/22 1:28 PM
***Deadline for amended pleadings terminated. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/09 4:36 PM
ORDER: The court DENIES any relief requested in the14 letter, DIRECTS the clerk to send Dominique D. Steele a Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form with this cause number on it, ORDERS Dominique D. Steele to submit a complete complaint on that form by 12/4/23 and CAUTIONS Dominique D. Steele that if he does not do so by the deadlinethis case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 11/9/23. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
15 15 misc Receipt Mon 11/06 4:58 PM
RECEIPT of copy of DE1 and DE1 - 1 from Dominique D Steele. (Attachment: #1 Envelope).(nhc)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Mon 11/06 4:05 PM
Letter to Judge Brady from Dominique D Steele. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (no case number included with filing). (nhc)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 11/06 2:33 PM
ORDER: The Court DENIES any relief requested in the letter11 ; EXTENDS the deadline for Dominique D. Steele to submit a complaint on the Courts approved Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form, which can be found in his prison law library, to 12/04/2023; and CAUTIONS Dominique D. Steele that if he does not do so by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 11/06/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
12 12 service Proposed Summons Thu 11/02 3:52 PM
Proposed Summons filed by Dominique D Steele.(shk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, October 30, 2023
11 11 misc Letter Thu 11/02 3:33 PM
Letter from Dominique Steele to Judge Collins. (shk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 10/26 11:57 AM
ORDER: The court DENIES the motion for summary judgment9 ; EXTENDS the deadline for Dominique D. Steele to submit a complaint on the court's approved Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form, which can be found in his prison law library, to 11/10/2023; and CAUTIONS Dominique D. Steele that if he does not do so by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 10/25/23. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nhc)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Summary Judgment Wed 10/25 4:02 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Dominique D Steele. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Mon 10/23 12:50 PM
ORDER: The Court REMINDS Dominique D. Steele that he has until 10/27/2023, to submit a complaint on the Court's approved Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form, which can be found in his prison law library; and CAUTIONS Dominique D. Steele that if he does not do so by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/23/23. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nhc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 10/20 4:05 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court ORDERS the plaintiff, Dominique D. Steele, IDOC # 181166, to immediatelypay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $5.18 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full, DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these fund and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 10/19/23. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Mail Returned Thu 10/19 2:56 PM
Mail Returned from Dominique D Steele as to case # 1:23cv412 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(50710594,'Steele_v_Galipeau_et_al',1);">1 Pro Se Complaint and Docket Sheet. Envelope marked Return to Sender - Refused - Enclosed Item not Allowed. Related [+] (ash)
Related: [-] sent to plaintiff with Docket Sheet from 3:23cv875
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/19 11:29 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Dominique D Steele.. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Prisoner Ledger,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, October 16, 2023
4 4 misc Letter Tue 10/17 7:48 PM
Letter from Dominique Steele to Judge Collins requesting to file a Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Deposition. (shk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, September 29, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 09/29 3:19 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS Dominique D. Steele until 10/27/2023, to respond to this Order by either submitting complaint on the Court's approved form and resolving his filing fee status as stated above or filing a notice with the court indicating the Notice of Tort Claim was filed here in error; and CAUTIONS Dominique D. Steele that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 9/29/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ash)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
2 2 1 pgs order Order Wed 09/27 2:32 PM
ORDER: The clerk is DIRECTED to close this case and open a new case with these filings in the South Bend Division with the same judges. New case number 3:23-cv-875.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 09/27/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party with docket sheet) (jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
1 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Jason English, John Galipeau, Westville Correctional Subordanates, filed by Dominique D Steele. No IFP or filing fee received. (File stamped copy mailed plaintiff)(ash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Envelope