North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Referred: Kimberly A Swank
Case #: 5:23-cv-00516
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 8:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Holly Hill Hospital
Plaintiff
Sherry A. Moore
12500 Garden Tree Lane
Raleigh, NC 27614


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
6 6 respoth Objection to Memorandum and Recommendations Tue 03/05 4:49 PM
OBJECTION to5 Memorandum and Recommendation. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transcript,
Att: 2 Request for Leave,
Att: 3 Notes,
Att: 4 Employee Corrective Action Report,
Att: 5 Email Correspondence,
Att: 6 Calendars and Notes,
Att: 7 Envelope
utility Motion Submitted Tue 03/05 4:53 PM
M&R Submitted to Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding5 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
5 5 8 pgs motion Memorandum and Recommendations Wed 02/21 12:39 PM
ORDER AND MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION regarding 1 Complaint and 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis [DE #2] is ALLOWED and it is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's federal claims be dismissed. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly A Swank on 2/21/2024. (Copy of order and M&R mailed to Plaintiff.) (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
utility Motion Referred Thu 10/05 3:28 PM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A Swank regarding2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 09/27 9:06 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Sherry A. Moore. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Self-Representation Wed 09/27 9:06 AM
Notice of Self-Representation filed by Sherry A. Moore. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/27 9:05 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Sherry A. Moore. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 9:04 AM
COMPLAINT against Holly Hill Hospital, filed by Sherry A. Moore. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 2 Exhibit Determination and Notice of Rights,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons