New York Southern District Court
Case #: 7:23-cr-00454
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Sep 28, 2023 9:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Greg Brown (2)
Represented By
Kenneth Jamal Montgomery
Kenneth J. Montgomery
contact info
Michael T. Mervis
Proskauer Rose Llp (nyc)
contact info
Tony Mirvis
The Mirvis Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Carl Henry (3)
Represented By
Bruce D. Koffsky
Koffsky & Felsen, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Amari Jackson (4)
Represented By
James Michael Roth
Stampur & Roth (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Kayshawn Massop (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Andrew Ken-Wei Chan
United States Attorney'S Office, Southern District Of N
contact info
Mary Christine Slavik
Doj-Usao
contact info
Ben Arad
Doj-Usao
contact info
Benjamin David Klein
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/28/2023 10:01 AM EDT
Monday, September 19, 2022
1 1 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (lnl) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
COMPLAINT UNSEALED as to Greg Brown. (ap) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
2 2 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause) (ap) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
3 3 Order to Unseal Case as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 10/20/2022) (ap) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Initial Appearance as to Greg Brown held on 10/20/2022. Detention Hearing as to Greg Brown held on 10/20/2022. AUSA Benjamin Klein for the Government. Tony Mervis for the Defendant. BAIL DISPOSITION: DETENTION: RISK OF FLIGHT/DANGER; SEE TRANSCRIPT. The defendant was advised of his rights and the charges against him. Public reading of the complaint waived. Detention hearing held. Defendant detained based on risk of flight and danger to the community. TRAVEL RESTRICTED TO SDNY/EDNY/NDNY. PRELIMINARY HEARING DATE: 11/16/22. ON DEFENDANT'S CONSENT. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap) Modified on 10/21/2022 (ap). Modified on 10/24/2022 (ap). [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
5 5 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Greg Brown from the United States District Court - Southern District of Texas. (dif) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tony Mirvis appearing for Greg Brown. Appearance Type: Retained. (Mirvis, Tony) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
7 7 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Greg Brown. Time excluded from 11/16/2022 until 12/14/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 11/16/2022) (ap) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
8 8 2ND ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Greg Brown. Time excluded from 12/14/2022 until 1/11/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 12/14/2022) (ap) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
9 9 AFFIRMATION of Benjamin Klein in Support by USA as to Greg Brown re:8 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
10 10 3RD ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Greg Brown. Time excluded from 1/11/2023 until 2/8/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 1/11/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
11 11 AFFIRMATION of Benjamin Klein in Support by USA as to Greg Brown re:10 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
12 12 27 pgs TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Greg Brown re: Hearing held on 10/20/2022 before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Marissa Mignano (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/16/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2023. (js) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Greg Brown. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Hearing proceeding held on 10/20/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (js) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
14 14 4TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Greg Brown. Time excluded from 2/8/2023 until 3/8/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 2/8/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
15 15 AFFIRMATION of Benjamin Klein in Support by USA as to Greg Brown re:14 4TH Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 25, 2023
16 16 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Greg Brown from4 Initial Appearance, Detention Hearing,,,,. Appeal Case Number 22-mj-7592-UA.(Mirvis, Tony) Modified on 2/27/2023 (fk). [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 27 pgs Exhibit Detention Hearing Transcript,
Att: 2 10 pgs Exhibit Dkt. 2 - Complaint,
Att: 3 7 pgs Exhibit Carl Henry Complaint,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit Dkt. 4
Monday, February 27, 2023
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Tony Mirvis as to Greg Brown: to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Appeal of a USMJ Decision to a District Judge, Document No. 16. This case is not ECF. (fk) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
17 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Greg Brown on re:16 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case, filed by Greg Brown. ENDORSEMENT: The Government is to respond to this submission by 3/15/23. So Ordered: ( Responses due by 3/15/2023 )(Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/7/2023)(bw) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
18 18 1 pgs 5TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Greg Brown. Time excluded from 3/8/2023 until 4/5/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 3/8/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs AFFIRMATION of Benjamin Klein in Support by USA as to Greg Brown re:18 5TH Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Bail Review Hearing as to Greg Brown held on 3/30/2023. Defendant present with attorney Tony Mirvis, AUSA Benjamin Klein for the Government. Court reporter, Angela O'Donnell. Defendant, Greg Brown requests a bail review hearing. Judge McCarthy denied bail on October 20, 2022. Bail denied. Defendant remanded. (bw) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
20 20 1 pgs 6TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Greg Brown. Time excluded from 4/5/2023 until 5/3/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 4/5/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
21 21 AFFIRMATION of Benjamin Klein in Support by USA as to Greg Brown re:20 6TH Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
22 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kenneth Jamal Montgomery appearing for Greg Brown. Appearance Type: Retained. (Montgomery, Kenneth) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
23 23 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 7TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Greg Brown. Time excluded from 5/3/2023 until 5/31/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 5/3/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
24 24 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 8TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Greg Brown. Time excluded from 5/31/2023 until 6/28/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 5/31/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
25 25 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 9TH ORDER FCONTINUANCE as to Greg Brown. Time excluded from 6/28/2023 until 7/26/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 6/28/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
26 26 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 10TH ORDER OF as to Greg Brown. Time excluded from 7/26/2023 until 8/3/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 7/26/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
27 27 2 pgs STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 11TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Greg Brown. Time excluded from 8/23/2023 until 9/20/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 8/23/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07592-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
1 1 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (ap)
Related: [-]
2 2 19 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 6, 7, 10, 11, 15, 16, 17, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, 4, 5, 10, 11, 12-13, 14, 15, 16, 17, Sealed Defendant 3 (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 8, 9, 15, 16, 17, Sealed Defendant 4 (4) count(s) 1, 8, 9, 15, 16, 17. (lnl)
Related: [-]