Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffery W Cavender
Case #: 1:23-bk-59481
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Terminated:Jul 09, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Feb 28, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Brandon Hall School, Inc.
1701 Brandon Hall Dr
Atlanta, GA 30350-3706
Represented By
Ian M. Falcone
The Falcone Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Federal Building 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
misc 06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Discharge not applicable Tue 07/09 9:20 AM
Case Closed. (jlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
133 133 trustee Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution F-non-consensual plan consummated, fees awarded Mon 07/08 11:25 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee's Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $11392.80. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 9 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $8280171.18, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: $7233529.75, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $7233529.75. filed by Trustee. (Jones, Leon)
Related: [-]