Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah K Chasanow
Case #: 8:23-cv-02638
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 9:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Daniel G Schuster
Represented By
Darryl G McCallum
Shawe And Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Defendant
Schuster Concrete Ready Mix, LLC
Represented By
Darryl G McCallum
Shawe And Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Cox
Represented By
Howard Benjamin Hoffman
Hoffman Employment Law, LLC
contact info
Jordan Song En Liew
Hoffman Employment Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/26 4:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) by Michael Cox(Liew, Jordan)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 06/26 5:28 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING16 joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 6/26/2024. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 04/02 9:15 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING14 consent motion to amend scheduling order. Discovery closes and a status report is due by 7/1/2024; the dispositive motions deadline is 7/29/2024. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/2/2024. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
14 14 motion Amend/Correct Mon 04/01 7:01 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Michael Cox(Liew, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 29, 2024
12 12 motion Other Relief Mon 01/29 10:36 AM
Joint MOTION for Other Relief (Entry of a Stipulated Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material) by Michael Cox(Liew, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Other Relief Mon 01/29 12:04 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING12 joint motion for the entry of a stipulated order regarding confidentiality of discovery material and APPROVING [12-1] Stipulated Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 1/29/2024. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 12/06 3:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING10 joint motion to amend scheduling order and bifurcate discovery as to damages. The parties will submit a proposed scheduling order with deadlines for discovery on damages within 14 days after the court decides any motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/6/2023. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
10 10 motion Amend/Correct Tue 12/05 6:14 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and Bifurcate Discovery by Michael Cox(Liew, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 20, 2023
order Order Fri 10/20 10:05 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER THANKING the parties for8 joint initial status report. Discovery closes and a status report is due by 4/1/2024; the dispositive motions deadline is 4/30/2024. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 10/20/2023. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
8 8 misc Status Report Thu 10/19 4:53 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by Michael Cox(Liew, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
7 7 respm Response Tue 10/10 2:11 PM
RESPONSE re3 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Defendants Schuster Concrete Ready Mix, LLC and Daniel G. Schuster's Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Daniel G Schuster, Schuster Concrete Ready Mix, LLC.(McCallum, Darryl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
6 6 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/05 5:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery closes and a status report is due by 2/20/2024; the dispositive motions deadline is 3/18/2024. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 10/5/2023. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 10/05 3:41 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Schuster Concrete Ready Mix, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Schuster Entities Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate DGS Construction, LLC, Other Affiliate Daniel G. Schuster, LLC, Other Affiliate Freedom Concrete, LLC, Other Affiliate Schuster DC, LLC for Schuster Concrete Ready Mix, LLC.(McCallum, Darryl)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/05 3:14 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint Defendants Schuster Concrete Ready Mix, LLC and Daniel G. Schuster's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Daniel G Schuster, Schuster Concrete Ready Mix, LLC.(McCallum, Darryl)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Fri 09/29 8:40 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - State Court Docs Fri 09/29 8:39 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (2) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 8:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Daniel G Schuster, Schuster Concrete Ready Mix, LLC, filed by Michael Cox.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Docket,
Att: 2 Case Information Report
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 09/28 2:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Prince George's County, Maryland, case number C-16-CV-23-003160. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10843345), filed by Daniel G Schuster, Schuster Concrete Ready Mix, LLC.(McCallum, Darryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Case Information Report Filed,
Att: 4 Exhibit Demand/Request for Jury Trial,
Att: 5 Exhibit Writ of Summons,
Att: 6 Exhibit Writ of Summons,
Att: 7 Exhibit Writ of Summons,
Att: 8 Exhibit Summons Issued,
Att: 9 Exhibit Return of Service,
Att: 10 Exhibit Affidavit of Service,
Att: 11 Exhibit Entry of Appearance of Darryl McCallum,
Att: 12 Exhibit State Court Docket,
Att: 13 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal