Nevada District Court
Judge:Miranda M Du
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:23-cv-01541
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Case in other court:District Court, A-23-876405-C
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 1:50 AM PDT
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By
Sabrina G. Wibicki
Harper Selim
contact info
James Ernest Harper
Harper Selim
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Sotelo
Represented By
Peter Maitland Angulo
Angulo Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/23 10:10 AM
ORDER granting34 Stipulation to Stay Case for 90 Days Pending Binding Arbitration. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that the above-entitled action be stayed in its entirety as to all discovery and/or pre-trial deadlines for 90 days, up to and including 7/21/2025. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/22/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
34 34 motion Stipulation Mon 04/21 2:29 PM
STIPULATION TO STAY CASE for 90 Days Pending Binding Arbitration by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harper, James) (stay) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/23 10:25 AM
ORDER granting32 Stipulation to Stay Case for 90 Days Pending Binding Arbitration. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that the above-entitled action be stayed in its entirety as to all discovery and/or pre-trial deadlines for 90 days, up to and including 4/21/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/22/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
32 32 motion Stipulation Tue 01/21 1:23 PM
Second STIPULATION TO STAY CASE for 90 Days Pending Binding Arbitration by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harper, James) (stay) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 09/09 3:06 PM
ORDER granting30 Stipulation to Stay Case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that the above-entitled action be stayed in its entirety as to all discovery and/or pre-trial deadlines for 120 days, up to and including December 20, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
30 30 motion Stipulation Fri 09/06 12:41 PM
STIPULATION TO STAY CASE for 120 Days Pending Binding Arbitration by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harper, James) (stay) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
29 29 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Protective Order Fri 07/12 2:03 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting28 Stipulation for Protective Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/11/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
28 28 motion Stipulation Wed 07/10 2:45 PM
STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order Governing Confidential Information by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harper, James) (other) (protective)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order Tue 07/09 3:18 PM
ORDER Granting25 Stipulation to Extend Time To File Stipulated Protective Order through and including 7/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
26 26 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 07/03 10:20 AM
ORDER granting25 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 11/22/2024. Motions due by 12/23/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/24/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/1/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Stipulation Mon 07/01 4:15 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harper, James) (extend) Related [+]
Related: [-] ferral
24 24 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Mon 07/01 3:55 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.23 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request). Discovery due by 11/22/2024. Motions due by 12/23/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/24/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/1/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA) (Main Document 24 replaced on 7/1/2024) (GA)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
23 23 motion Stipulation Fri 06/28 11:50 AM
Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) Stipulation and Order to Extend Discovery (Third Request) by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harper, James) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
22 22 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 05/30 4:19 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that State Farm's motion for a protective order17 is granted in part and denied in part. The Court grants State Farm's request that the Court find a protective order appropriate. The Court denies State Farm's request that it enter State Farm's proposed terms. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer and attempt to stipulate to a protective order governing the exchange of discovery. The parties must file their stipulated protective order, or motion regarding the protective order language, on or before 7/1/2024 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in any stipulated protective order that the parties eventually submit, they must not include the following sentence: [t]he Parties further agree, should the receiving or requesting party be successful in obtaining an Order or Ruling indicating a designation is inappropriate, improper, or erroneously applied, that designating Party may be obligated to pay the attorney fees and costs associated with the successful filing of the motion before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/30/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
21 21 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Mon 04/08 3:10 PM
ORDER Granting20 Stipulation to Extend Time. Discovery due by 9/23/2024. Motions due by 10/22/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
20 20 motion Stipulation Thu 04/04 2:49 PM
Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harper, James) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
19 19 respm Reply Tue 03/26 10:09 AM
REPLY to Response to17 Motion for Protective Order, by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harper, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
18 18 respm Response Tue 03/19 3:03 PM
RESPONSE to17 Motion for Protective Order, by Plaintiff Jose Sotelo. Replies due by 3/26/2024. (Angulo, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
17 17 motion Motion Protective Order Tue 03/12 3:52 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Responses due by 3/26/2024.(Wibicki, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 01/10 3:26 PM
ORDER granting15 Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 6/24/2024. Motions due by 7/24/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/10/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
15 15 motion Stipulation Mon 01/08 3:45 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harper, James) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
minord Minute Order Order on Stipulation Mon 01/08 1:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/8/2024. Re: 13 Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Having reviewed the parties' stipulation, the Court notes that it does not include a specific description of the discovery that remains to be completed as required by Local Rule 26-3(b). IT IS THEREFORE ORDRED that the stipulation 13 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
13 13 motion Stipulation Fri 01/05 12:07 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harper, James) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Wed 11/22 11:59 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (CT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 11/22 11:15 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting10 Revised Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/26/2024. Motions due by 4/25/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/28/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
10 10 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 11/20 8:41 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Harper, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
minord Minute Order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 11/14 5:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/14/2023. Re: 8 Discovery Plan. Having reviewed the parties' stipulated discovery plan, which purports to be submitted in compliance with LR 26-1(b), the Court notes that the parties actually seek special scheduling review. The parties request that the Court set a 180-day schedule measured from the parties' 26(f) conference. However, LR 26-1(b)(1) provides that discovery should be measured from the date the first defendant answers or appears. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the parties' discovery plan 8 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a revised stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order in compliance with Local Rule 26-1 by November 22, 2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
8 8 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 11/13 11:22 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Harper, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
7 7 misc Status Report Tue 10/24 2:32 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Harper, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Tue 10/10 8:33 AM
ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal,, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/20/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/24/2023.(Harper, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
5 5 misc Statement in Removal Case Mon 10/02 1:55 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Harper, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 10/02 1:53 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Harper, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
order Standing Order Fri 09/29 2:33 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
2 2 minord Minute Order Removal Case Thu 09/28 1:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/28/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/13/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Thu 09/28 10:37 AM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Case Number A-23-876405-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7442358) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/8/2023. (Harper, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 09/28 1:43 PM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)
Related: [-]