Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Gretchen S Lund
Case #: 1:23-cv-00418
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Terminated:Jun 10, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
20 20 misc Clerks Judgment Tue 06/11 11:52 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (ash)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
19 19 11 pgs order Opinion and Order Terminate Civil Case Tue 06/11 11:48 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: The Defendant's Decision is AFFIRMED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 6/10/2024. (ash)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
18 18 ss Social Security Reply Brief of Plaintiff Tue 06/04 8:37 PM
REPLY BRIEF re17 Social Security Response Brief of Government,8 Social Security Opening Brief of Plantiff by Edward G. Pena. (de la Torre, Adriana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
17 17 ss Social Security Response Brief of Government Wed 05/22 3:28 PM
RESPONSE BRIEF re8 Social Security Opening Brief of Plantiff by Commissioner of Social Security. (Payne, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/22 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay B Payne on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Payne, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Fri 05/03 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (de la Torre, Adriana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/02 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Antonio Lee - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Lee - AUSA, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/30 10:29 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the12 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 6/5/2024. Text entry by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 4/30/2024. (jss)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/29 6:12 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 Social Security Opening Brief of Plantiff (Unopposed) by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Seagle, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/01 11:36 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the10 Defendant's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 5/8/2024. Text only entry by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 4/1/2024. (jss)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/01 11:18 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 Social Security Opening Brief of Plantiff (Unopposed) by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Seagle, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 03/25 12:02 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Gretchen S Lund for all further proceedings. Judge William C Lee no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 3/25/2024. (lns)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
8 8 ss Social Security Opening Brief of Plaintiff Wed 02/28 4:44 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY OPENING BRIEF by Edward G. Pena. (de la Torre, Adriana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
7 7 misc Status Report Wed 01/17 12:03 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT STATUS REPORT) by Commissioner of Social Security. (Seagle, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
6 6 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/05 12:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall participate in at least one settlement conference within 30 days of the date of service of the Administrative Record. Within 14 days after said settlement conference, the parties shall file with the court a Joint Status Report as outlined. The parties shall commence briefing as outlined if parties report in their Joint Status Report that settlement is not possible. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 12/5/2023. (lns)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
5 5 ss Social Security Administrative Record Mon 12/04 2:10 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Commissioner of Social Security. (Seagle, Catherine)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/04 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A Seagle on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Seagle, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Commencement of SSA Action Fri 09/29 9:11 AM
Notice of Commencement of Social Security Appeal action (1 Complaint) sent to the Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security Answer or Motion due 11/28/2023. Pursuant to General Order #2022-20, the briefing schedule is as follows: The plaintiff's opening brief must be filed within 42 days after the answer is filed or 42 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion under Rule 4(c) of the Supplemental Rules, whichever is later. The Commissioner's response brief must be filed 42 days after service of the opening brief. Any reply brief must be filed 14 days after service of the response brief. (ash)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 09/29 9:09 AM
Judge William C Lee added. **NEW CASE** (ash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/28 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana M de la Torre on behalf of Edward G. Pena (de la Torre, Adriana)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/28 9:35 AM
COMPLAINT Seeking Judicial Review against Commissioner of Social Security( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5367001.), filed by Edward G. Pena.(de la Torre, Adriana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet