Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Theresa L Springmann
Referred: Andrew P Rodovich
Case #: 2:23-cv-00323
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Terminated:Nov 16, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
UR Mendoza Jaddou
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Plaintiff
Gautamkumar Prajapati
Represented By
Lauren McClure
Kriezelman Burton And Associates LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, November 16, 2023
utility Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1 Thu 11/16 10:42 AM
CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (jss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/15 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gautamkumar Prajapati (McClure, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 09/29 10:05 AM
Summons Issued as to UR Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (rmc)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 09/29 9:41 AM
Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. **NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING** (rmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
2 2 motion Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/28 11:38 AM
Application for Attorney Lauren McClure to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gautamkumar Prajapati. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5367276(McClure, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/28 11:36 AM
COMPLAINT Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5367248.), filed by Gautamkumar Prajapati.(McClure, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons