Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:John E Martin
Referred: John E Martin
Case #: 2:23-cv-00325
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
NiSource
Represented By
Scott T Allen
Foley & Lardner Llp - Mil/wi
contact info
Philip B Phillips
Foley & Lardner Llp - Det/mi
contact info
Plaintiff
Shirley J. Barnes-Gray
6424 Garfield Street
Merrillville, IN 46410


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, March 14, 2025
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 03/14 11:23 AM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery on finding of good cause. Deadline for Completion of Discovery is 5/30/2025. Mediation to be completed by 5/30/2025. Future requests for extension disfavored and likely to require a hearing.Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/14/2025. No pdf attached.(cp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
29 29 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 03/13 4:15 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Mediation Deadlines by Defendant Northern Indiana Public Service Company LLC. (Williams, Katelynn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/27 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katelynn M Williams on behalf of Northern Indiana Public Service Company LLC (Williams, Katelynn)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 01/06 1:26 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Scott T Allen ORDERED WITHDRAWN. Attorney Philip B. Phillips remains counsel of record for Defendant. Text order entry. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/6/2025. (smb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 12/27 9:17 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Expert Discovery deadline is 4/1/2025. Fact Discovery deadline is 4/1/2025. Mediation to be completed and report filed by 4/1/2025. Further extensions are disfavored and may require a hearing. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/27/2024. No pdf attached. (djs)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 12/23 1:53 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend Mediation Deadline by Defendant Northern Indiana Public Service Company LLC. (Phillips, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
24 24 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 12/20 10:07 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Northern Indiana Public Service Company LLC. (Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/25 9:51 AM
Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Other Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Jury Demand ANSWER to Complaint by Northern Indiana Public Service Company LLC.(Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 06/21 9:20 AM
Set Deadline per22 Agreed Notice. Dft Northern Indiana Public Service Company LLC answer due 7/25/2024. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
22 22 notice Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer Thu 06/20 4:00 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Northern Indiana Public Service Company LLC ; answer due by July 25, 2024. (Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Full Consent to Magistrate Judge - Standard Fri 06/14 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge John E Martin for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to the most recent General Order regarding civil case assignment from Senior Judge James T Moody to Magistrate Judge John E Martin. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
20 20 misc Amended Document - NOT Motion Thu 06/13 5:51 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Shirley J. Barnes-Gray. Amendment to1 Pro Se Complaint . (Bullock, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 06/07 3:34 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend His [sic] Complaint18 and ORDERS that Plaintiff shall have through 6/14/2024, to file the Amended Complaint, currently docketed as an attachment to the instant Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/7/2024. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
18 18 motion Amend/Correct Thu 06/06 10:13 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Pro Se Complaint by Plaintiff Shirley J. Barnes-Gray.(Bullock, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, June 03, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 06/04 4:02 PM
ORDER: Upon review of the report16 , the Court hereby ORDERS Rule 26(a)(1) initial exchanges must be completed, but not filed with the Court, by 8/1/2024; Plaintiff's deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 9/3/2024; Defendant's deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 10/2/2024; The deadline to complete all fact and expert discovery is 1/31/2025; Plaintiff's expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Defendant by 9/30/2024; Defendant's expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Plaintiff by 10/31/2024; Rule 26(e) supplements are due by 12/2/2024; The parties are ordered to conduct mediation and the deadline to select a mediator is 10/2/2024; and mediation must be completed and a report filed by 1/31/2025; and The deadline to return the consent to or declination of exercise of jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge is extended to 6/24/2024. The Court VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for June 6, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/3/24. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
16 16 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Fri 05/31 3:24 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
15 15 minutes Telephone Conference Thu 05/09 11:20 AM
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held 5/9/2024 before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Pla appeared by atty Bryan Bullock. Dft appeared by atty Scott Allen. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference RESET to 6/6/2024 11:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin to allow counsel to meet and confer with a new discovery plan given Atty Bullock's recent appearance into case. Amended proposed discovery plan to be filed by 5/31/2024. Parties to call 833-568-8864; enter Meeting ID 161 0956 8055; Push # to skip Participant ID; enter Passcode 815985 when prompted. Any motion for leave to amend pleadings to be filed by 6/6/2024 with the proposed amended complaint attached as an exhibit to the motion. Clerk directed to regenerate magistrate consent forms - counsel given an extension to return the forms through 5/31/2024 directly to clerks office. (#FTR.) (smb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/07 7:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan K Bullock on behalf of Shirley J. Barnes-Gray (Bullock, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
13 13 minutes Telephone Conference Tue 03/19 1:09 PM
Scheduled for Rule 16 Preliminary Conference 3/14/2024 before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Pla Shirley Barnes-Gray appeared pro se. Dft appeared by atty Scott Allen. At the request of Plaintiff, the Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is RESET to 5/9/2024 10:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin to allow Plaintiff adtl time to retain counsel. Parties to call 833-568-8864; enter Meeting ID 161 0956 8055; Push # to skip Participant ID; enter Passcode 815985 when prompted. Court will not require a revised case management plan be filed and will revise the scheduling plan where necessary at the time of the conference. Pla is relieved of Court order to participate on 5/9/2024 only in the event retained counsel has filed their written appearance with the Court. (copy to Pla pro se) (smb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Fri 03/08 9:52 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 01/26 2:12 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Motion to Delay/Reschedule10 , VACATES the conference currently scheduled for 2/1/2024, and SETS a telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference for 3/14/2024, at 11:00 a.m. (Central Time), with parties to file their report of parties' planning meeting by 3/8/2024. Parties are instructed to call 833-568-8864; enter Meeting ID 161 0956 8055; Push # to skip Participant ID; enter Passcode 815985 when prompted. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to RETAIN AS SEALED the motion at10 , but REMINDS Plaintiff that she must follow all applicable rules, and ADVISES her that if, in the future, she wishes to file motions or other documents under seal, she must file a motion seeking leave to do so, and explain why filing under seal is appropriate, analyzing the applicable legal criteria. The Court WARNS Plaintiff that failure to do so may result in the motion or document being stricken or filed on the public docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/26/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (rmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
10 10 motion Sealed Motion Thu 01/25 5:01 PM
SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Shirley J. Barnes-Gray. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 01/04 12:04 PM
ORDER/RESET HEARING: On the Court's own motion, the Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference on 1/18/2024 @ 11:00 AM is RESET to 2/1/2024 11:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Parties are instructed to call 833-568-8864; enter Meeting ID 161 0956 8055; Push # to skip Participant ID; enter Passcode 815985 when prompted. Parties are given an extension of time to submit a joint proposed discovery plan through 1/26/2024. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/4/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(smb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
8 8 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Tue 12/05 10:26 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (copy to pro se party)(smb)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/05 10:25 AM
ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2024 11:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Joint proposed discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 1/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/5/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(smb)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Tue 12/05 10:02 AM
ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/5/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(smb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/17 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip B Phillips on behalf of Nisource (Phillips, Philip)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/17 3:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nisource. (Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/17 3:24 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Nisource.(Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 09/28 2:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Nisource. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nhc)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Pro Se Complaint Thu 09/28 2:28 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Nisource (Filing fee $ 402.00.) Receipt #1548, filed by Shirley J. Barnes-Gray. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit). (nhc)
Related: [-]