Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 3:23-cv-00877
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilites Act
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Terminated:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Warsaw County Board of Education
Represented By
James Alex Emerson
Coots Henke & Wheeler PC
contact info
Matthew L Hinkle
Coots Henke & Wheeler PC
contact info
Mediator
Richard McDevitt
Vouga & Associates LLC 2252 W 93rd Avenue
Merrillville, IN 46410
Plaintiff
Kristina Moore
Represented By
Sarah Guffey
Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Andrew Dutkanych, III
Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer Llc - Ind/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, September 06, 2024
19 19 order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Civil Case Fri 09/06 3:31 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to18 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss. Parties to bear their own fees and costs. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 9/6/24. (dnj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
18 18 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Wed 09/04 3:12 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Defendant Warsaw County Board of Education. (Emerson, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
17 17 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/13 10:16 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
16 16 notice Notice - Other Tue 03/12 2:36 PM
NOTICE by Warsaw County Board of Education Joint Notice of Selection of Mediator (Emerson, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 02/29 11:52 AM
ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to file a notice of selection of a mediator instanter. If nothing is filed by 03/14/2024, the Court will take steps necessary to appoint a mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 02/28/2024. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Failure to Return Consent Form (Standard) Thu 02/08 2:56 PM
NOTICE: Counsel for Kristina Moore and Counsel for Warsaw County Board of Education were directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #11 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. Counsel for Kristina Moore and Counsel for Warsaw County Board of Education shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by correspondence. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 01/08 2:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 01/24/2024. The last date to amend the pleadings without leave of court as to plaintiff(s) is 02/19/2024; as to defendant(s) is 02/26/2024. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff(s) by 10/01/2024; and from defendant(s) by 11/15/2024. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) is due every six weeks until trial. The last date for the completion of ALL DISCOVERY is 12/31/2024. The deadline to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion is 12/03/2024. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 01/30/2025, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with N.D. Ind. L.R. 56-1(b)-(c). The parties shall name a mediator no later than 02/23/2024. The deadline for the parties to engage in mediation is 01/17/2025. The Court hereby VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for January 17, 2024, at 11:45 a.m. EST. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 01/08/2024. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Wed 01/03 4:43 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Emerson, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
11 11 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Tue 11/28 10:40 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/28 10:13 AM
ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 1/3/2024. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2024 11:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/28/23. (slm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/22 1:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Warsaw County Board of Education.(Emerson, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 10/26 11:58 AM
Reset Deadlines: Warsaw County Board of Education Answer due 11/24/2023 pursuant to DE8 . (kmt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
8 8 notice Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer Wed 10/25 5:22 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Warsaw County Board of Education ; answer due by 11/24/2023. (Emerson, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/25 5:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Alex Emerson on behalf of Warsaw County Board of Education (Emerson, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/25 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L Hinkle on behalf of Warsaw County Board of Education (Hinkle, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/10 4:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristina Moore. Warsaw County Board of Education served on 10/5/2023, answer due 10/26/2023. (Guffey, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 09/29 10:25 AM
Summons Issued as to Warsaw County Board of Education. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 09/29 10:20 AM
***NEW CASE*** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/28 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of KRISTINA MOORE (Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/28 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Guffey on behalf of KRISTINA MOORE (Guffey, Sarah)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/28 9:58 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against WARSAW COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5367038.), filed by KRISTINA MOORE.(Guffey, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons