Fowler v. AT&T Inc. et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03172 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 4:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
AT&T Inc.
208 S. Akard Street 30th Floor
Dallas, TX 43204 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
AT&T Teleholdings, Inc.
30 S. Wacker Dr. Floor 34
Chicago, IL 60606 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ohio Bell Telephone Company
4400 Easton Commons Way Suite 125
Columbus, OH 43219 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacey R. Fowler
5512 York Lane
Columbus, OH 43232 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
order
Related Case Memorandum 1 - Terminate Deadlines
Tue 04/16 1:16 PM
|
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/05 10:03 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth Gage as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/5/2024. (mas) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/04 1:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9904967) of Kenneth W. Gage by Defendants AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Squillante, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 03/26 4:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order Staying Discovery filed by Defendants AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Day, Jourdan) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 03/26 3:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Plaintiff Stacey R. Fowler. (Organ, Connor) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/12 2:33 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Defendants AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Day, Jourdan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jaime Mata | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/12 1:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order Staying Discovery filed by Plaintiff Stacey R. Fowler. (Organ, Shawn) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/07 9:31 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James P. de Haan as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 7, 2024. (jlk) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/06 2:38 PM
NOTICE by Defendants AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Ohio Bell Telephone Company re16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9832696) of James P. de Haan Supreme Court of California Certificate of Good Standing for James P. de Haan (Squillante, Sarah) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 03/04 3:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Plaintiff Stacey R. Fowler. (Organ, Shawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice)
Mon 02/26 12:46 PM
Notice of Deficiency re: The submitted certificate is not from the highest court of a State. Related Document:16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9832696) of James P. de Haan filed by Ohio Bell Telephone Company, AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., AT&T Inc. Deficiency Deadline by 3/11/2024. (jlk) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/23 11:23 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9832696) of James P. de Haan by Defendants AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Day, Jourdan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Protective Order
Tue 02/20 2:59 PM
MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order Staying Discovery by Defendants AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Day, Jourdan) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 01/30 3:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 1/30/2024. Discovery temporarily stayed. Defendants to file Motion for Protective Order by 2/19/2024. (sln) |
||
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 01/23 5:39 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Stacey R. Fowler. (Organ, Connor) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 01/04 1:22 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Defendants AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Day, Jourdan) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 01/03 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2024 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 12/21 5:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Stacey R. Fowler. (Organ, Shawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of S. Fowler, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of K. Fraser | ||
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 12/01 3:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Day, Jourdan) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Compel
Fri 12/01 3:49 PM
MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Defendants AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Day, Jourdan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brandy Giordano in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of John B. Cunningham in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Michael D. Albert in Support, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Declaration of Jaime Mata | ||
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 10/23 3:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ohio Bell Telephone Company on 10/6/2023, answer due 12/5/2023. (Organ, Connor) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 10/23 3:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to AT&T Teleholdings, Inc. on 10/6/2023, answer due 12/5/2023. (Organ, Connor) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 10/23 3:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to AT&T Inc. on 10/6/2023, answer due 12/5/2023. (Organ, Connor) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/04 8:58 AM
Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (ds) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 10/03 5:26 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Organ, Connor) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Mon 10/02 11:04 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Sarah D. Morrison recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 10/2/2023. (merc) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Fri 09/29 1:31 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Edmund A. Sargus recused. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah D. Morrison for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/29/2023. (cmw) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
31
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/28 2:05 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9622117), filed by Stacey R. Fowler. (Organ, Shawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - OCRC Right to Sue Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |