Nevada District Court
Judge:Cristina D Silva
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:23-cv-01546
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Terminated:Jan 17, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
7 7 order Judgment Wed 01/17 2:04 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Nevada Department of Corrections, The Attorney General of the State of Nevada against Steven Canonico. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 1/17/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Petition Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 01/17 2:02 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Steven Canonico. (JQC)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/17 1:51 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the petition is dismissed without prejudice as set forth in this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability will not issue. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 1/17/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/16 1:13 PM
ORDER. It is therefore ordered that within 30 days of the date of this order, petitioner must submit either the $5.00 filing fee or a fully completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ordered that failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action withoutprejudice and without further notice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to retain the petition but not file it at this time. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 11/16/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
3 3 notice Advisory Letter Habeas only - FORM Mon 10/02 3:17 PM
NOTICE from USDC advising case against Nevada Department of Corrections, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:23-cv-01546-CDS-EJY . (CJS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc QC Notice Mon 10/02 3:14 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Electronic filing of prisoner filings in civil rights cases at High Desert State Prison is now mandatory under General Order 2012-01. (CJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Mon 10/02 3:12 PM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (CJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Petition