West Virginia Northern District Court
Case #: 5:23-cv-00308
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party
Social Security Administration
Plaintiff
Melissa L Troia

GPO Sep 29 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 9/29/23. (lmm)
GPO Oct 27 2023
IRMED, and plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 2 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/27/2023. (ag)ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. A review of the record indicates that the magistrate judge's report accurately summarizes this case and the applicable law. As such, the magistrate judge's report and recommendation 4 is AFF
GPO Apr 19 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned would RECOMMEND that Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART and that Defendant's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 4/19/24. (lmm)
GPO May 08 2024
by REMANDED to the ALJ for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/8/24. (lmm)ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendant's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. This mailer is here


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.