Khan v. Fox Corporation et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine Polk Failla |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-08576 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices) |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Fox News Network, LLC
1211 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Gregory Headen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tariq Khan
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Fox Corporation
Terminated: 02/06/2024
1211 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
![]() STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) James Gregory Headen, Fox News Network, LLC and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by James Gregory Headen, Fox News Network, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Evans, Paul) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 8:42 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Paul Evans. RE-FILE Document No. 32 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The document is missing the signature date of Plaintiff's attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km) |
||
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) James Gregory Headen, Fox News Network, LLC and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by James Gregory Headen, Fox News Network, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Evans, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR THE PRODUCTION AND EXCHANGE OF CONFIDENTIAL / HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...This confidentiality agreement does not bind the Court or any of its personnel. The Court can modify this stipulation at any time. The Court will retain jurisdiction over the terms and conditions of this agreement only for the pendency of this litigation. Any party wishing to make redacted or sealed submissions shall comply with Rule 9 of this Court's Individual Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/29/2024) (rro) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC, James Gregory Headen..(Evans, Paul) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than October 31, 2024. All expert discovery, including reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions, shall be completed no later than January 15, 2025. Depositions of fact witnesses shall be completed by September 30, 2024. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and the present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2024 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/26/2024) (rro) |
|
28 | 28
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:26 Letter filed by Tariq Khan. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Court will separately enter the parties' proposed case management plan. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 30, 2024, is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. In light of the six-month period provided for fact discovery, the parties' are advised that the Court will grant no further extensions, absent exigent circumstances. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/26/2024) (rro) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Tariq Khan..(Ottinger, Robert) |
|
26 | 26
![]() JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Ottinger dated 04/25/2024 re: Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Tariq Khan..(Ottinger, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() ORDER: On April 3, 2024, the Court was notified that mediation in this matter was unsuccessful. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to attend a telephonic initial pretrial conference on April 30, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. At the designated time, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749, and use access code 5123533. The Court expects that the parties will submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan on or before April 25, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/16/2024) ( Initial Conference set for 4/30/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (ks) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
adr
Mediation Conference Scheduled
Thu 03/14 1:17 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 4/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sge) |
||
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 3/11/2024. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr) |
|
adr
Notice of Mediator Assignment
Mon 02/26 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 3/27/2024.(sge) |
||
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint. Document filed by James Gregory Headen..(Katzenstein, Krissy) |
|
21 | 21
![]() ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC..(Katzenstein, Krissy) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending19 Amended Complaint, against Fox News Network, LLC, James Gregory Headen with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Tariq Khan. Related document:19 Amended Complaint,..(Ottinger, Robert) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Mon 02/05 1:41 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Walter Ottinger to RE-FILE Document No. 19 Second Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Second Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) |
||
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint,16 Amended Complaint against Fox News Network, LLC, James Gregory Headen with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Tariq Khan. Related document:1 Complaint,16 Amended Complaint..(Ottinger, Robert) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:17 Letter, filed by James Gregory Headen, Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before February 2, 2024. Thereafter, Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint on or before February 16, 2024. ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/2/2024.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/22/2024) (rro) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Krissy A. Katzenstein dated January 19, 2024 re: Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, James Gregory Headen..(Katzenstein, Krissy) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending15 Amended Complaint, against Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, James Gregory Headen with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Tariq Khan. Related document:15 Amended Complaint,..(Ottinger, Robert) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Mon 01/08 2:38 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Walter Ottinger to RE-FILE Document No. 15 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) |
||
Friday, January 05, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Tariq Khan. Related document:1 Complaint..(Ottinger, Robert) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on13 terminating10 Letter Motion for Conference re:10 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Krissy Katzenstein dated December 1, 2023. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' pre-motion letter (Dkt. #10), as well as Plaintiff's above response (Dkt. #13). The Court appreciates the parties' efforts to resolve the matter amongst themselves. Pursuant to the above, Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before January 7, 2024. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket number 10. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/7/2023) (rro) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 12/07 3:05 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2024. (rro) |
||
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Ottinger dated 12/06/2023 re:10 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Krissy Katzenstein dated December 1, 2023. . Document filed by Tariq Khan..(Ottinger, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Fox Television Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent FOX Corporation, Corporate Parent Fox Television Stations, LLC for Fox News Network, LLC. Document filed by Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC..(Katzenstein, Krissy) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/04 10:23 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Krissy A Katzenstein to RE-FILE Document No. 11 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb) |
||
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC..(Katzenstein, Krissy) |
|
10 | 10
![]() LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Krissy Katzenstein dated December 1, 2023. Document filed by Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, James Gregory Headen..(Katzenstein, Krissy) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Krissy A Katzenstein on behalf of Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, James Gregory Headen..(Katzenstein, Krissy) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul C. Evans on behalf of Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, James Gregory Headen..(Evans, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. James Gregory Headen waiver sent on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. Document filed by Tariq Khan..(Ottinger, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Fox News Network, LLC waiver sent on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. Document filed by Tariq Khan..(Ottinger, Robert) |
|
5 | 5
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Fox Corporation waiver sent on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. Document filed by Tariq Khan..(Ottinger, Robert) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, James Gregory Headen. (vf) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 09/29 9:53 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 09/29 9:54 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 09/29 9:54 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, and James Gregory Headen, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Tariq Khan..(Ottinger, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ottinger, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, James Gregory Headen. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28355431)Document filed by Tariq Khan..(Ottinger, Robert) |