New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:23-cv-20773
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
DIVINE-SEVEN EL
Defendant
YVENSON ISRAEL
Represented By
AMAR ANAND AGRAWAL
Eisenberg, Gold & Agrawal, PC
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL JEX
Defendant
RENAN DE ROCHA GOMES BASTOS
Represented By
ELYSE NICOLE COHEN
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough
contact info
Defendant
CFT SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By
ELYSE NICOLE COHEN
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough
contact info
Defendant
CHUCK MARSHALL
Defendant
ELIDO SANTANA
Defendant
ARTHUR PERCY
Represented By
ELYSE NICOLE COHEN
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough
contact info
Notice Only
PHV ELAINE N. KUSSURELIS
Notice Only
PHV JUSTIN B. KAPLAN
Plaintiff
LUIS PINOS
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
GABRIELA JANETA ROMAN
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BARRY ROSNER
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE LINDA MASTERS
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AHMED SHARAFELDIN
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
STUART WAYNE SPRINGFIELD
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER EMANUEL SZABO
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LINWOOD WALKER
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT YENG
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RICARDO MARQUEZ
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ASHER BOMANI LEWIS
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KHALED ELSISI
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AHMED KHDER
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
NAJY KANAN
Represented By
ELENA FAST
contact info
JOHN E. JENKINS
Lubiner, Schmidt & Palumbo, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
122 122 motion Dismiss Mon 05/19 3:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by YVENSON ISRAEL. Responses due by 6/2/2025.(AGRAWAL, AMAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/19 4:44 PM
Set Deadlines as to122 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint . Motion set for 6/16/2025 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
121 121 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/19 1:15 PM
ORDER granting117 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/16/2025. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
120 120 order Order Fri 05/16 10:05 AM
TEXT ORDER: The United States Magistrate Judge will rule on any discovery disputes in this case; contrary to the suggestion in the Plaintiffs' brief, see ECF118 , the Court did not say otherwise. So Ordered by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 5/16/2025. (ro, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
119 119 misc Letter Fri 05/16 9:14 AM
Letter to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz re: Defendants' Motion for Clarification and to Compel Attendance at Deposition/Request for Extension of Time. Related [+] (mj)
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
118 118 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 11:59 AM
Plaintiffs' Opposition to116 Motion to Compel filed by KHALED ELSISI, NAJY KANAN, AHMED KHDER, ASHER BOMANI LEWIS, RICARDO MARQUEZ, CHRISTINE LINDA MASTERS, LUIS PINOS, GABRIELA JANETA ROMAN, BARRY ROSNER, AHMED SHARAFELDIN, STUART WAYNE SPRINGFIELD, CHRISTOPHER EMANUEL SZABO, LINWOOD WALKER, ROBERT YENG Related [+] (Notice of Mail) (adc, )
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
117 117 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 05/15 10:44 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer.(COHEN, ELYSE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/15 11:46 AM
Set Deadlines as to116 MOTION to Compel and for Clarification of the Second Jurisdictional Discovery Order . Motion set for 6/16/2025 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
116 116 motion Compel Wed 05/14 3:51 PM
MOTION to Compel and for Clarification of the Second Jurisdictional Discovery Order by CFT SOLUTIONS, LLC, RENAN DE ROCHA GOMES BASTOS, ARTHUR PERCY.(COHEN, ELYSE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit A