Schuller v. New York Life Insurance Company
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard E Myers, II |
Referred: | Brian S Meyers |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00531 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Wake County Superior Court, 23-CVS-22383-910 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 8:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
New York Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason A. Schuller
Raleigh, NC 27612
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jason A. Schuller (Malone, J.) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Donna O. Tillis on behalf of New York Life Insurance Company. (Tillis, Donna) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 02/12 9:54 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding16 Notice of Special Appearance,17 Notice of Special Appearance, and18 Notice of Special Appearance. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance to be recognized by the court as counsel of record for a party. (McNally, Kimberly) |
||
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Chelsea K. Barnes on behalf of New York Life Insurance Company. (Barnes, Chelsea) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Chelsea K. Barnes on behalf of New York Life Insurance Company. (Barnes, Chelsea) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Chelsea K. Barnes on behalf of New York Life Insurance Company. (Barnes, Chelsea) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER Appointing Mediator. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/22/2023. (McNally, Kimberly) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Selection of David S. Coats as mediator filed by Jason A. Schuller. (Malone, J.) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Wilmington - Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II. Discovery due by 7/31/2024. Mediation Deadline set for 7/31/2024. Motions due by 8/30/2024. Jury Trial set for 1/7/2025 at 10:00 AM in Wilmington - Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 11/17/2023. (Sellers, N.) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by New York Life Insurance Company. (Barnes, Chelsea) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Financial Disclosure Statement by Jason A. Schuller (Malone, J.) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/2/2023. (McNally, Kimberly) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ANSWER to Complaint by New York Life Insurance Company. (Barnes, Chelsea) |
|
utility
Case Selected for Mediation
Fri 09/29 10:37 AM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. (McNally, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Appearance filed by J. Michael Malone on behalf of Jason A. Schuller. (Malone, J.) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Order Redesignating Division to Western Division. The Honorable Richard E. Myers II, Chief United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future filings should reflect the new case number of 5:23-CV-531-M-BM. No further filing shall be made in 4:23-CV-151-M-BM. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/27/2023. (McNally, Kimberly) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer
Thu 09/28 8:56 AM
Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 09/28/2023. Former Case Number 4:23-cv-151. (McNally, Kimberly) |
||
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Notice of Removal - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.) | ||
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) | ||
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event Notice - Other. Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.) | ||
Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.) | ||
Notice to Counsel regarding:1 Notice of Removal - Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit 1" is not a sufficient description). No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.) | ||
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |