California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:23-cv-01752
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Sep 29, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:33 AM PDT
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
Marilyn Ember
Interested party 1420 South Figueroa Street, Apt. 107
Los Angeles, CA 90015
Defendant
Patrick Gilmore
Plaintiff
RP/Essex Skyline Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Shelley M Crawford
Kimball Tirey And St John LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, December 15, 2023
13 13 misc Mail Returned Thu 12/21 9:39 AM
Mail Returned addressed to Marilyn Ember re Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60),7 (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
12 12 misc Mail Returned Tue 12/05 6:09 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Marilyn Ember re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form6 (rolm)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Mail Returned Tue 12/05 6:08 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Marilyn Ember re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form5 (rolm)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Mail Returned Tue 12/05 5:49 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Marilyn Ember re Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form8 (rolm)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Mail Returned Tue 12/05 1:40 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Marilyn Ember re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form4 (rolm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
8 8 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Mon 10/02 2:44 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Orange. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Orange. (twdb)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Mon 10/02 2:41 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Non Prisoner Case). This case is REMANDED to state court as explained in the attached statement. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 09/28 9:27 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 09/28 9:26 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 09/28 9:25 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Thu 09/28 9:24 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Marilyn Ember. (jtil)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 09/28 9:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Marilyn Ember. (jtil)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 09/28 9:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, filed by Defendant/Interested Party Marilyn Ember. Case number 30-2023 01325501 with copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter, Discovery to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
Related: [-]