Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Darrel James Papillion
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:23-cv-05629
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 5:11 AM CDT
Defendant
AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By
Robert I. Siegel
Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, Llc (new Orleans)
contact info
Jody McMillan
Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse
contact info
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Davidson
Represented By
Irl R. Silverstein
Irl R. Silverstein
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
18 18 21 pgs order Order Wed 01/15 12:30 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Thu 08/22 2:46 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Dismiss Case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Darrel James Papillion on 08/22/2024. (ko)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Thu 08/22 9:55 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re15 Motion to Dismiss: 1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Dismiss Case. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. 2. Filing attorney did not enter additional filer in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer. (ko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss Wed 08/21 12:52 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by AIG Property Casualty Company.(Anderson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 21, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order Fri 06/21 9:47 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record Tue 05/07 11:58 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Kyle Demoine' Anderson for AIG Property Casualty Company. Signed by Judge Darrel James Papillion on 05/07/2024. (ko)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
12 12 motion Enroll as Counsel of Record Mon 05/06 1:19 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by AIG Property Casualty Company.(Siegel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 11, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 04/11 11:55 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney John E. Baay, II for AIG Property Casualty Company. Attorney Jody McMillan terminated. Signed by Judge Darrel James Papillion on 04/11/2024. (ko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
10 10 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 04/10 4:56 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney John E. Baay to be substituted in place of J. Clark McMillan by AIG Property Casualty Company.(Siegel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
9 9 30+ pgs order Order Wed 12/20 2:12 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Tue 11/28 1:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, by AIG Property Casualty Company.(McMillan, Jody)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
7 7 misc ADI event Thu 10/12 5:36 PM
Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
6 6 30+ pgs order Order Fri 10/06 12:58 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(ko)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, September 29, 2023
5 5 misc Initial Case Assignment Fri 09/29 11:03 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Darrel James Papillion and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (mb)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/29 9:51 AM
NOTICE by AIG Property Casualty Company re1 Notice of Removal, . (McMillan, Jody)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Compliance Fri 09/29 9:51 AM
Notice of Compliance by AIG Property Casualty Company re1 Notice of Removal,. (McMillan, Jody)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Fri 09/29 9:50 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by AIG Property Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Company, Corporate Parent Vanguard Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc. for AIG Property Casualty Company (McMillan, Jody)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 09/29 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-07518 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10184921) filed by AIG Property Casualty Company.Attorney Jody McMillan added to party AIG Property Casualty Company(pty:dft).(McMillan, Jody)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Record,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Dec Page