New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:23-cv-20775
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Mar 08, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 6:11 AM EDT
Defendant
MARK NOIA
Plaintiff
C&A MARKETING, INC.
Represented By
HENRY A. GABATHULER
Leason Ellis LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
BRAD CHAPMAN
Terminated: 01/23/2024
Defendant
RAGHNALL RAFI
Terminated: 01/23/2024
Defendant
RBM SALES LLC
Terminated: 01/23/2024


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, March 08, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 03/08 4:36 PM
NOTICE & ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of defendant Mark Noia. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/8/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Thu 03/07 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Mark Noia by C&A MARKETING, INC. (GABATHULER, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 01/23 4:40 PM
NOTICE & ORDER of voluntary dismissal as to defendants RBM SALES LLC, BRAD CHAPMAN and RAGHNALL RAFI. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 1/23/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Mon 01/22 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Raghnall Rafi, Brad Chapman, and RBM Sales LLC by C&A MARKETING, INC. (GABATHULER, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/10 4:51 PM
LETTER ORDER granting a 60-day stay in this matter pending consummation of the settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/10/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
14 14 misc Letter Tue 01/09 1:37 PM
Letter from Jason Mushnick on behalf of Defendant Mark Noia. (MUSHNICK, JASON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 12/26 10:26 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document13 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MARK NOIA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/9/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
13 13 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 12/22 1:39 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Mark Noia.. (MUSHNICK, JASON)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
12 12 order Order Reassigning Case Wed 11/29 4:20 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Esther Salas for all further proceedings. Judge Kevin McNulty no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/29/2023. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/06 2:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C&A MARKETING, INC.. MARK NOIA waiver sent on 10/25/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (GABATHULER, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/16 1:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by C&A MARKETING, INC.. BRAD CHAPMAN served on 10/13/2023, answer due 11/3/2023. (GABATHULER, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/10 5:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by C&A MARKETING, INC.. RAGHNALL RAFI served on 10/5/2023, answer due 10/26/2023. (GABATHULER, HENRY)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/10 5:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by C&A MARKETING, INC.. RBM SALES LLC served on 10/5/2023, answer due 10/26/2023. (GABATHULER, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 10/04 12:14 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRAD CHAPMAN, MARK NOIA, RAGHNALL RAFI, RBM SALES LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
6 6 service Summons - Request for Issue Fri 09/29 11:10 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by C&A MARKETING, INC. as to RBM SALES LLC. (GABATHULER, HENRY)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons - Request for Issue Fri 09/29 11:09 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by C&A MARKETING, INC. as to BRAD CHAPMAN. (GABATHULER, HENRY)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons - Request for Issue Fri 09/29 11:08 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by C&A MARKETING, INC. as to RAGHNALL RAFI. (GABATHULER, HENRY)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons - Request for Issue Fri 09/29 11:07 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by C&A MARKETING, INC. as to MARK NOIA. (GABATHULER, HENRY)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 09/29 11:04 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by C&A MARKETING, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (GABATHULER, HENRY)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 11:02 AM
COMPLAINT against BRAD CHAPMAN, MARK NOIA, RAGHNALL RAFI, RBM SALES LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14746921) with JURY DEMAND, filed by C&A MARKETING, INC..(GABATHULER, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Articles of Organization,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Website Screenshot,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Website Screenshot,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - NDA Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Website Screenshot,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Website Screenshot,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Website Screenshot,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 09/29 4:32 PM
Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)
Related: [-]