Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Referred: Aileen Goldman Durrett
Case #: 4:23-cv-00867
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Feb 03, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 5:02 AM CDT
Defendant
Hayley Witte
Conley Rosenberg & Mendez P.C. 14160 Dallas Parkway Suite 800
Dallas, TX 75254
Represented By
Jay M Rosenberg
Conley Rosenberg & Brenneise LLP
contact info
Phillip John Conley
Conley Rosenberg & Mendez P.C.
contact info
Chris Wellman
Wellman And Warren, LLP
contact info
Scott W Wellman
Wellman And Warren, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pruvit Ventures, Inc.
Scheef & Stone, LLP 2600 Network Boulevard Suite 400
Frisco, TX 75034
Represented By
Kelly Elizabeth Kleist
Scheef & Stone Llp - Frisco
contact info
Byron Kevin Henry
Scheef & Stone Llp - Frisco
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Saturday, February 03, 2024
15 15 4 pgs order Permanent Injunction Judgment Mon 02/05 10:32 AM
AGREED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/3/2024. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/09 10:10 AM
ORDER. On December 6, 2023, the court entered an Agreed Permanent Injunction (Dkt.13 ). It is hereby ORDERED that the above referenced Agreed Permanent Injunction (Dkt.13 ) is withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 1/9/2024. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
13 13 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 12/06 6:00 PM
AGREED PERMANENT INJUNCTON granting11 Motion for Entry of Agreed Permanent Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 12/6/2023. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/21 1:22 PM
ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that, on or before Friday, December 22, 2023, the Parties shall submit to the court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket of the court. It is further ORDERED that the trial of this case and all remaining pretrial deadlines and conferences are hereby cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 11/21/2023. (baf, )
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 11/21 11:33 AM
JOINT MOTION enter injunction re5 Amended Complaint by Pruvit Ventures, Inc..(Kleist, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Additional Attachment(s) Ex. A Injunction
Monday, November 20, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 11/20 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Pruvit Ventures, Inc. (Kleist, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/14 7:32 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Scott W Wellman on behalf of Hayley Witte. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9818503. (Wellman, Scott)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/14 7:26 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Chris Wellman on behalf of Hayley Witte. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9818498. (Wellman, Chris)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/14 7:21 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott W Wellman on behalf of Hayley Witte (Wellman, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
6 6 2 pgs notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 11/06 5:45 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Pruvit Ventures, Inc. (Henry, Byron)
Related: [-]
5 5 11 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/06 5:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hayley Witte, filed by Pruvit Ventures, Inc..(Henry, Byron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 11/01 9:58 AM
REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 11/1/2023. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Fri 10/06 10:20 AM
ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/06/2023. (jmb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
2 2 16 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 1:28 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** VERIFIED ORIGINAL PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION against Hayley Witte, filed by Pruvit Ventures, Inc. (jmb, )
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 09/29 12:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hayley Witte from 199th Judicial District Court, case number 199-05555-2023. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9731375), filed by Hayley Witte.(Conley, Phillip) (jmb, ). Modified on 9/29/2023 (jmb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Additional Attachment(s)-LR CV81 Information
Att: 3 (9/29/2023) Witte Affidavit,
Att: 4 (9/29/2023) Attachment,
Att: 5 (9/29/2023) Wellman Affidavit
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/29 1:23 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (jmb, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Fri 09/29 1:24 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (jmb, )
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 09/29 1:29 PM
Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (jmb, )
Related: [-]