Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:23-cv-00420
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Jan 16, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 6:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Jonesboro, Indiana
Represented By
James Alex Emerson
Coots Henke & Wheeler PC
contact info
Matthew L Hinkle
Coots Henke & Wheeler PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Andrews
Represented By
Stevie J Pactor
Aclu Of Indiana
contact info
Kenneth J Falk
Aclu Of Indiana
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/24 11:36 AM
ORDER: The parties Joint Motion for Relief from Judgment or Order to Reflect that Stipulation is Without Prejudice20 is granted and ORDERS that the dismissal of this case is without prejudice, with each party to pay its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 1/23/2024. (ash)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 21, 2024
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Sun 01/21 8:18 PM
Joint MOTION for Relief from Judgment or Order to Reflect that Stipulation is Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Jason Andrews. (Falk, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
19 19 order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/16 10:26 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to18 STIPULATION to Dismiss. Parties to bear their own fees and costs. Plaintiff's17 MOTION to Extend Time to Seek to Leave to Amend the Pleadings is MOOT. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 1/16/24. (dnj)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
18 18 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Mon 01/15 3:07 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice by Plaintiff Jason Andrews. (Falk, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 13, 2024
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Sat 01/13 11:31 AM
MOTION to Extend Time to Seek to Leave to Amend the Pleadings (Further Motion - Unopposed) by Plaintiff Jason Andrews. (Falk, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
16 16 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 12/28 1:06 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The15 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Seek Leave to Amend the Pleadings is granted. The deadline for Plaintiff to seek leave to amend the pleading is extended to and including 1/16/2024. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 12/28 10:06 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Seek Leave to Amend the Pleadings (Unopposed) by Plaintiff Jason Andrews. (Falk, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/22 1:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Jonesboro, Indiana.(Hinkle, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/16 2:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 12/1/2023. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 6/3/2024. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 3/1/2024; and from Defendant by 4/1/2024. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 1/2/2024; as to Defendant is 2/2/2024. The last date to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion shall be 30 days prior to the discovery deadline. The parties are encouraged to engage in direct negotiations and/or alternative dispute resolution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 11/15/2023. (sej)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Wed 11/15 12:33 PM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2023 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Kenneth Falk. Dft appeared by atty Matthew Hinkle. The11 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Parties discussed ADR and possibility of a judicial settlement conference. Parties directed to file a notice with the Court regarding same. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/6/2023. The presiding Judge will hold a status conference to set a final pretrial conference and trial. To facilitate this status conference and a prompt trial date, the last date to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion shall be 30 days prior to the discovery deadline. No motion to extend discovery or to continue other pretrial deadlines will be approved after this motion deadline, except upon a showing of extraordinary reasons directed to the presiding judge. Good cause will not be sufficient to constitute an extraordinary reason. Accordingly, the parties are advised to complete timely discovery and, if necessary, file any motion to continue pretrial deadlines, motion to compel, or such motions that may impact the schedule well in advance of this motion deadline to permit any necessary briefing and time for the court to rule. (FTR 1st Floor.) (ash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Thu 11/09 12:41 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Falk, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
10 10 notice Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer Tue 10/24 4:27 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Jonesboro, Indiana ; answer due by 11/24/2023. (Hinkle, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
9 9 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Tue 10/17 9:04 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Tue 10/17 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2023 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate the call. (mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/16 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Alex Emerson on behalf of Jonesboro, Indiana (Emerson, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/16 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L Hinkle on behalf of Jonesboro, Indiana (Hinkle, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/11 11:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Andrews. Jonesboro, Indiana served on 10/4/2023, answer due 10/25/2023. (Falk, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 10/02 7:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Jonesboro, Indiana. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kmt)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 10/02 7:29 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stevie J Pactor on behalf of Jason Andrews (Pactor, Stevie)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J Falk on behalf of Jason Andrews (Falk, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Jonesboro, Indiana( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5368679.), filed by Jason Andrews.(Falk, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons