Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Philip P Simon
Referred: Joshua P Kolar
Case #: 2:23-cv-00328
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause42:1320 Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Nov 28, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 6:04 AM EDT
Defendant
CarePointe, P.C.
Represented By
Kevin E Steele
Burke Costanza & Carberry Llp - Val/in
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Indiana Ex Rel. Rokita
Represented By
Douglas S Swetnam
contact info
Jennifer M Van Dame
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
11 11 misc Clerks Judgment Tue 11/28 1:32 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (jdb) (jdb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/28/2023) Corrected Clerk's Judgment
10 10 order Judgment - Consent Order Tue 11/28 1:30 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER GRANTING8 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Plaintiff State of Indiana Ex Rel. Rokita. The Court has reviewed the terms of this Consent Judgment and based upon the Parties' agreement and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED as outlined in this order. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED in favor of Plaintiff, State of Indiana Ex Rel. Rokita against Defendant, CarePointe, P.C. in the amount of $125,000. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/28/2023. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
9 9 respm Brief in Support Mon 11/27 12:06 PM
BRIEF in Support of8 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by State of Indiana Ex Rel. Rokita.(Van Dame, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer M. Van Dame
8 8 motion Approve Consent Judgment Mon 11/27 12:03 PM
Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Plaintiff State of Indiana Ex Rel. Rokita.(Van Dame, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Consent Judgment
Monday, November 20, 2023
7 7 order Order Mon 11/20 11:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/20/2023. (tc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/17 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E Steele on behalf of CarePointe, P.C. (Steele, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/02 4:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Indiana Ex Rel. Rokita. CarePointe, P.C. waiver sent on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (Van Dame, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 10/02 8:05 AM
Summons Issued as to CarePointe, P.C.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 10/02 8:04 AM
Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. **NEW CASE** (mrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas S Swetnam on behalf of STATE OF INDIANA EX REL. ROKITA (Swetnam, Douglas)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M Van Dame on behalf of STATE OF INDIANA EX REL. ROKITA (Van Dame, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 9:44 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against CAREPOINTE, P.C.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5368469.), filed by STATE OF INDIANA EX REL. ROKITA.(Van Dame, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons