Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Philip P Simon
Referred: Abizer Zanzi
Case #: 2:23-cv-00330
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Dec 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 6:05 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Coleman Jet, LLC
Represented By
Brian K Jackson
Laner Muchin Ltd
contact info
Emily Dybas PHV
Laner Muchin Ltd
contact info
Counter Defendant
Gary Sheradsky
Represented By
Ryan W Sullivan
Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Andrew Dutkanych, III
Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Coleman Jet, LLC
Represented By
Brian K Jackson
Laner Muchin Ltd
contact info
Emily Dybas PHV
Laner Muchin Ltd
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary Sheradsky
Represented By
Ryan W Sullivan
Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Andrew Dutkanych, III
Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer Llc - Ind/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, December 20, 2024
36 36 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 12/20 4:28 PM
ORDER: The Parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal35 is SO ORDERED. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, without costs to any party. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/20/2024. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
35 35 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Thu 12/19 8:54 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Plaintiff Gary Sheradsky, Counter Defendant Gary Sheradsky. (Sullivan, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
34 34 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 10/15 4:35 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 10/15/2024 before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Pla appeared by atty Ryan Sullivan. Dft appeared by atty Brian Jackson. Settlement has been reached. The parties are to file dismissal papers by 1/7/2025. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/9/2025 at 10:00 AM CST before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. If dismissal paperwork has been filed prior to the status hearing, hearing will be vacated. (FTR.) (shk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
33 33 order Order Tue 09/24 12:30 PM
ORDER: Upon receipt of the parties' Status Report32 , the Court VACATES the status hearing scheduled for 9/26/2024 at 10:30 AM. Text entry by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 9/24/2024. (shk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
32 32 misc Status Report Thu 09/19 4:09 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Coleman Jet, LLC. (Jackson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
31 31 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 09/05 2:43 PM
ORDER on Settlement Conference. Parties are to submit to the Court by 10/8/2024, by 12:00 P.M. (CST) a brief Confidential Settlement Memorandum as outlined in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 9/5/2024. (shk)
Related: [-]
30 30 minutes Telephone Conference Motion Hearing Thu 09/05 2:30 PM
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 9/5/2024, before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi re MOTION for Settlement Conference28 . Pla appeared by atty Andrew Dutkanych. Dft appeared by atty Brian Jackson. The Motion for Settlement Conference is GRANTED. Court stays oral discovery pending settlement conference. ZOOM Settlement Conference set for 10/15/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. (FTR.) (Formal Order to Follow) (shk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
29 29 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 08/21 3:04 PM
ORDER/SET HEARING re28 MOTION Requesting Settlement Conference. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/5/2024 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. The parties should be prepared to offer the Court multiple mutually agreeable dates in September and October for the proposed judicial settlement conference and to better explain the scope of the stay being requested. Text entry Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 8/21/2024. (shk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
28 28 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 08/19 2:10 PM
MOTION Requesting Settlement Conference (Joint Motion) by Counter Claimant Coleman Jet, LLC, Defendant Coleman Jet, LLC. (Jackson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 08/05 3:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING26 Joint Motion to Extend the Discovery deadline and ORDERING that the date to complete all fact discovery is EXTENDED to 10/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 8/5/2024. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
26 26 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 08/02 11:01 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Counter Claimant Coleman Jet, LLC, Defendant Coleman Jet, LLC. (Jackson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
25 25 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 07/17 3:37 PM
AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER re23 Agreed Motion for Confidentiality Order by Counter Claimant Coleman Jet, LLC, Defendant Coleman Jet, LLC. as outlined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 7/17/2024. (mrm)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Telephone Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 07/17 12:49 PM
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/17/2024, before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Pla appeared by atty Ryan Sullivan. Dft appeared by atty Brian Jackson. Any motions to extend discovery should be filed by 8/2/2024. Court suggests to the parties if they would like to patriciate in mediation, a mediator would need to be selected, and mediation would need to be conducted prior to the case going to the District Court. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/26/2024 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Parties are to file a joint status report by 9/19/2024. (FTR.) (shk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
23 23 motion Protective Order Mon 07/15 4:23 PM
MOTION for Protective Order (Agreed Motion) by Counter Claimant Coleman Jet, LLC, Defendant Coleman Jet, LLC.(Jackson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Confidentiality Order
22 22 motion Protective Order Mon 07/15 4:16 PM
MOTION for Protective Order (Agreed Motion) by Counter Claimant Coleman Jet, LLC, Defendant Coleman Jet, LLC. (Jackson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
21 21 misc Status Report Tue 07/09 3:36 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Coleman Jet, LLC. (Jackson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 07/01 4:17 PM
Reset Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference reset for 7/17/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. To join the hearing, please call 833-568-8864 Meeting ID: 161 2255 6691# Push # to skip Participant ID Passcode: 252788# (shk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
20 20 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/27 1:22 PM
ORDER/SET HEARING: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/18/2024 at 10:30 a.m. CST before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Parties to file a joint status report regarding status of discovery, including discovery completed to date and anticipated discovery remaining, if any, and status of mediation or settlement discussions to date by 7/9/2024. To join the hearing, please call 833-568-8864 Meeting ID: 161 2255 6691# Push # to skip Participant ID Passcode: 252788#. Text order entry by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 6/27/2024. (shk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
19 19 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/12 5:05 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-11, this case is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Magistrate Judge John E Martin is no longer assigned to this case. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
18 18 3 pgs order Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/22 12:07 PM
ORDER granting17 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Emily Dybas PHV for Coleman Jet, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/22/2024. (ace)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
17 17 motion Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/21 12:54 PM
Application for Attorney Emily Dybas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Coleman Jet LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5524248(Dybas, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Good Standing
Thursday, February 01, 2024
16 16 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated Thu 02/01 6:43 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/22/2024. (ksc)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 02/01 6:40 PM
Judge update in case. Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar no longer assigned to case. NOTICE: Due to the backlog of cases caused by the pandemic and judicial vacancies, there is likely to be delay in the disposition of this case by a District Judge either by trial or other proceeding. The parties now have a second opportunity to consent to a Hammond magistrate judge to conduct any and all proceedings in this case, including entry of final judgment, in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and Local Rule 72-1. Rather than the previous random assignment of a magistrate judge, the parties can select which magistrate judge (Magistrate Judges John Martin or Andrew Rodovich) they prefer to hear this case. All parties must agree on which magistrate judge will hear the case and file an Agreed Notice of Full Consent. Only one Agreed Notice of Full Consent should be filed for all parties in this case. Absent an agreement, the case will remain on the docket of the district judge and no party should report to the court or chambers the inability to reach an agreement.(ksc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/19 11:01 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coleman Jet, LLC identifying Corporate Parent B Coleman Aviation LLC, Other Affiliate East Lake Management & Development Corp. for Coleman Jet, LLC, Coleman Jet, LLC.. (Jackson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 12/06 9:22 PM
Plaintiff/Counter Defendant's ANSWER to12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim to Defendant/Counter Plaintiff's Counterclaim by Gary Sheradsky.(Sullivan, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
13 13 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Thu 11/30 10:45 AM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/30/2023, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pla appeared by atty Ryan Sullivan. Dft appeared by atty Brian Jackson. The Report filed as DE11 is ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 12/8/2023. All discovery to be completed by 8/2/2024. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 4/12/2024. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 5/13/2024. The last date to seek leave of court to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings for Pltf is 12/29/2023; for Dft is 1/5/2024. Parties anticipate the case should be ready for a 3 day jury trial by December 2024. Parties reminded of disclosure obligations under General Order 2023-6. Court stresses importance of considering all ethical implications of using AI, including checking any cited authority. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/21/2023. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. (Tape #ZOOM 1.) (tc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 11/22 3:31 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against Gary Sheradsky by Coleman Jet, LLC.(Jackson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Vitae,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Agreement
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Wed 11/22 2:25 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sullivan, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/20 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan W Sullivan on behalf of Gary Sheradsky (Sullivan, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
9 9 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Fri 11/17 12:29 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 11/17 12:28 PM
ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2023 09:30 AM Central time before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 833-568-8864, enter Meeting ID 161 2255 6691 and passcode 252788 to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/17/2023. (tc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
7 7 order Order Thu 10/26 10:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/26/2023. (tc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 10/26 1:24 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 11/22/2023 per6 Notice. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
6 6 notice Notice - Other Wed 10/25 8:44 AM
NOTICE by Coleman Jet, LLC for Automatic Initial Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (Jackson, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/25 8:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian K Jackson on behalf of Coleman Jet, LLC (Jackson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/16 9:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Sheradsky. Coleman Jet, LLC served on 10/4/2023, answer due 10/25/2023. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 10/02 10:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Coleman Jet, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nhc)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 10/02 10:46 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of COLEMAN JET, LLC (Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 11:28 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against COLEMAN JET, LLC( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5368770.), filed by COLEMAN JET, LLC.(Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons