Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00878
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Terminated:Feb 13, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
11 11 misc Mail Returned Thu 02/29 9:07 AM
Mail Returned from Bryant Melton as Undeliverable -9 Order Dismissing Case and10 Clerks Judgment. Envelope marked Released, Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. (ash)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
10 10 misc Clerks Judgment Tue 02/13 3:07 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (sej)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/13 3:05 PM
ORDER: This case is DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 2/13/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sej)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
8 8 misc Mail Returned Tue 02/06 4:32 PM
Mail Returned from Bryant Melton as Undeliverable -7 Order to Show Cause. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 01/11 1:57 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff, Bryant Melton is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by 01/30/2024, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). He is CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 01/11/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
6 6 misc Mail Returned Tue 01/09 10:59 AM
Mail Returned from Bryant Melton as Undeliverable Related [+] -5 Order. (shk)
Related: [-] leased
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 12/13 12:57 PM
ORDER: Bryant Melton, is ORDERED to either pay the entire remaining balance of the filing fee ($349.99) or provide a written explanation showing cause why he has not paid the initial partial filing fee and any required installment payments WITH a copy of his inmate ledger showing every transaction since October 4, 2023. He is CAUTIONED if he does not respond by 1/3/2024, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/13/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nhc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
4 4 misc Filing Fee Received Wed 11/15 4:47 PM
Partial Initial Filing fee: $.01, receipt number SB 2174 (nae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/05 1:22 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERS the plaintiff, Bryant Melton, IDOC # 288975, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $20.67 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/4/23. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Westville as directed in Order). (nhc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/29 10:03 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Bryant Melton. (kmt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Fri 09/29 10:03 AM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Jason English, John Galipeau, Jackson, filed by Bryant Melton. (File stamped copy with case number sent to Melton)(kmt)
Related: [-]