North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Referred: Robert B Jones, Jr
Case #: 5:23-cv-00535
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 6:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Thomas Edward Bailey
Represented By
Elizabeth Hayes Overmann
Ragsdale Liggett, PLLC
contact info
John M. Nunnally
Ragsdale Liggett PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Corinna S. Bailey
Represented By
Elizabeth Hayes Overmann
Ragsdale Liggett, PLLC
contact info
John M. Nunnally
Ragsdale Liggett PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Corinna B. Parker
Represented By
Elizabeth Hayes Overmann
Ragsdale Liggett, PLLC
contact info
John M. Nunnally
Ragsdale Liggett PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Geoffrey V. Parker, Jr.
Represented By
Elizabeth Hayes Overmann
Ragsdale Liggett, PLLC
contact info
John M. Nunnally
Ragsdale Liggett PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Ronnie Adams, II
Represented By
David J. Martin
David J. Martin PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/07 3:57 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by William Ronnie Adams, II as to All Defendants. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
28 28 11 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Wed 07/17 4:09 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Corinna S. Bailey, Thomas Edward Bailey, Corinna B. Parker, Geoffrey V. Parker, Jr. (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Dismiss Wed 07/17 4:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Corinna S. Bailey, Thomas Edward Bailey, Corinna B. Parker, Geoffrey V. Parker, Jr. (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
26 26 11 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Wed 07/17 3:00 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding25 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Corinna S. Bailey, Thomas Edward Bailey, Corinna B. Parker, Geoffrey V. Parker, Jr. (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
25 25 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 07/17 2:58 PM
Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint by Corinna S. Bailey, Thomas Edward Bailey, Corinna B. Parker, Geoffrey V. Parker, Jr. (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
24 24 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/12 10:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Ronnie Adams, II. Thomas Edward Bailey served on 7/9/2024, answer due 7/30/2024. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/12 10:14 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Ronnie Adams, II. Corinna B. Parker served on 6/26/2024, answer due 7/17/2024. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
22 22 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/01 7:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Ronnie Adams, II. Corinna S. Bailey served on 6/29/2024, answer due 7/20/2024. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/01 7:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Ronnie Adams, II. Geoffrey V. Parker, Jr served on 6/28/2024, answer due 7/19/2024. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 05/22 10:48 AM
ORDER denying as moot16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/21/2024. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
utility Motion Submitted Wed 04/10 3:28 PM
Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/22 2:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by William Ronnie Adams, II. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/14 10:19 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Ronnie Adams, II. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
17 17 8 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Thu 02/01 4:47 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Corinna S. Bailey, Thomas Edward Bailey, Corinna B. Parker, Geoffrey V. Parker, Jr. (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss Thu 02/01 4:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Corinna S. Bailey, Thomas Edward Bailey, Corinna B. Parker, Geoffrey V. Parker, Jr. (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
utility Case Selected for Mediation Tue 01/30 4:39 PM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Tue 01/09 9:43 AM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/09 9:53 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time9 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants' have up to and including February 1, 2024, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/9/2024. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
15 15 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 01/03 5:26 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Thomas Edward Bailey (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 01/03 5:26 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Corinna S. Bailey (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 01/03 5:25 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Thomas Edward Bailey (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 01/03 5:24 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Geoffrey V. Parker, Jr (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 01/03 5:24 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Corinna S. Bailey (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 01/03 5:23 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Corinna B. Parker (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 01/02 5:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint, filed by Corinna S. Bailey, Thomas Edward Bailey, Corinna B. Parker, Geoffrey V. Parker, Jr. (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/02 5:49 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Hayes Overmann on behalf of All Defendants. (Overmann, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/02 5:47 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by John M. Nunnally on behalf of All Defendants. (Nunnally, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 10/16 8:49 AM
Summonses Issued as to Corinna S. Bailey, Thomas Edward Bailey, Corinna B. Parker, Geoffrey V. Parker, Jr. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
5 5 notice Notice-other Thu 10/12 3:17 PM
Notice filed by William Ronnie Adams, II Proposed Summons . (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
notice Notice to Counsel Tue 10/10 11:48 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding:4 Notice - Proposed Summons. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Counsel is directed to refile flattened summons. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 08, 2023
4 4 notice Notice-other Sun 10/08 9:30 PM
Notice filed by William Ronnie Adams, II . (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Sun 10/08 8:57 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by William Ronnie Adams, II (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 10/08 8:56 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by David J. Martin on behalf of William Ronnie Adams, II. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
notice Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure Mon 10/02 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to William Ronnie Adams, II. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 10/02 3:28 PM
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 10/02 3:29 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-2] Proposed Summons. Counsel should refile the proposed summons due to the fact that the one summons filed is blank and there should be one summons per defendant. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 10/02 3:33 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" ( the civil cover sheet ) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 10:48 AM
COMPLAINT against Thomas Edward Bailey ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7290413.), filed by William Ronnie Adams, II. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons